Thomas v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Katie Thomas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2010cv04042
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Strike and Substituted Complaint is stricken; and denying as moot 12 Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is allowed thirty (30) days following the entry of this Order to seek consent of the Defen dant or leave of Court to File any amended complaint in this matter. Further, the hearing on 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss currently set for 10/5/10 is continued and will be reset at a later date. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2010. (lw)
November 30, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America, recommending defendant's motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 30, 2010. (cap)
December 20, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 26 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 20, 2010. (cap)
February 16, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 33 Report and Recommendations, and granting 27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 16, 2011. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Thomas
Represented By: James W. Stanley, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]