Zurich Re (UK) Limited v. Wolf et al

Plaintiff: Zurich Re (UK) Limited
Defendant: Donn Wolf, Advantage Sales, Advantage Food Group, Steve Lovellette, Sonny Brubach and Ron Decker
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv04122
Filed: December 14, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Outside U.S.
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Desiree Kolbek, Amy Eddy, Jeanette Orlando, Nicole Farr, Summer Hagan, Jamie Rodriguez and Pebbles Rodriguez are Dismissed With Prejudice. Certain Defendants terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 25, 2013. (mll)
July 17, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Andrew Nagorski withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 17, 2014. (mll)
September 16, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 16, 2014. (mll)
October 14, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 55 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Advantage Food Group, Sonny Brubach, Donn Wolf, Ron Decker, Advantage Sales, Zurich Re (UK) Limited, ***Civil Case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 14, 2014. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zurich Re (UK) Limited v. Wolf et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich Re (UK) Limited
Represented By: Roberta Jill Benson
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Morgan Day Vaughan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donn Wolf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Food Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lovellette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Brubach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Decker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]