Lewis & Clark Outdoors, Inc. v. L. C. Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lewis & Clark Outdoors, Inc.
Defendant: L. C. Industries, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv05164
Filed: September 26, 2007
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2009 134 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion in Limine; denying 72 Motion in Limine; denying 73 Motion in Limine; denying 74 Motion in Limine; denying 75 Motion in Limine; denying 76 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 85 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 86 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 24, 2009. (tg)
October 27, 2009 156 Featured Case ORDER denying 146 and 152 Motions for Attorney Fees; granting 147 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 27, 2009. (jn)
October 27, 2009 157 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Lewis & Clark Outdoors, Inc. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 27, 2009. (jn)
October 31, 2008 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion for Protective Order as directed in the order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 30, 2008. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewis & Clark Outdoors, Inc. v. L. C. Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis & Clark Outdoors, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Don Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. C. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Terry W. Tippens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]