Steadfast Insurance Company v. United States of America

 
Case Number: 2:2006cv04686
Filed: July 27, 2006
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2009 160 Featured Case MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: Court ORDERS Plaintiff to notify the Court whether the Bingham McCutchen firm represents any party still actively involved in this case, and to do so by 8/17/2009. (jp)
November 10, 2009 166 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court GRANTES USA's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment precluding it from being held liable on the basis of operator liability 141 . (See attached Minute Order for further details). No hearing is necessary. FRCP 78; L.R. 7-15. This Order is not intended for publication or for inclusion in the databases ofWestlaw or LEXIS. (jp)
October 12, 2011 203 Featured Case MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court will not be able to preside over trial in this case on the scheduled date of December 6, 2011, and orders the parties to meet and confer and propose a trial date not earlier than mid-April of 2012. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than Monday, October 24, 2011. (jp)
January 30, 2012 208 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge A. Howard Matz re: Hearing on Motion to Intervene 207 . Correct Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (kbr)
March 5, 2012 210 Featured Case MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court prefers that the declarations of declarants from Phase I whose testimony will be proffered in Phase II be refiled. The presumptive trial schedule will be 9:00 a.m. to no on and 1:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. on any given day. Plaintiff's forthcoming motion regarding the precise dates for which interest on costs that are awarded would accrue must be filed by 3/9/2012. The opposition thereto must be filed by 3/16/2012 and any reply by 3/19/2012. Thereafter, the Court will take the matter under submission. Plaintiff's other forthcoming motion regarding whether AISLIC recovers for payments made to the water purveyors must be filed by 3/12/2012. The opposition thereto must be filed by 3/19/2012 and any reply by 3/22/2012. Again, the Court will take the motion under submission. Court Reporter: C Nirenberg. (jp) Modified on 3/7/2012 (jp).
March 16, 2012 213 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: Within one hour, the parties are to file separately a list containing (1) the names ofthe witnesses they intend to rely on at trial, and (2) the sequence in which they intend tocall the witnesses. The Court requires updated lists in light of that fact that many issueswere resolved at the March 5 Final Pretrial Conference. (smo)
January 22, 2013 224 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge A. Howard Matz, re Order 99 : WHEREAS, the parties having entered into a Settlement Agreement and Consent Order (Dkt. 98-2); that Agreement having provided that the United States was to pay $33,825,000 to Steadfast "[a]s soon as reasonably possible after the Effective Date"; the Effective Date having been specified in that Agreement as being "the date the Court approve[d] this Agreement"; the Court having approved it on 10/28/08 and in doing so filed an order expressly directing entry of Final Judgment (Dkt. 99), THEREFORE the Court now ORDERS the Clerk to close this case. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (smo)
July 7, 2014 250 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King. IT IS AGREED AND ORDERED that: This Agreement applies to, is binding upon, and inures to the benefit of AISLIC and the United States. Within ninety (90) days after the Effective Date of this Agreement, the Un ited States will pay $2,034,958.82 to AISLIC. If the Past Cost Payment is not made in full within ninety (90) days after the Effective Date of this Agreement, then interest on the unpaid balance shall be paid commencing on the 91st day after the Effective Date. Upon the Court's approval of this Agreement, all claims brought by AISLIC against the United States in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed with prejudice. Each Party shall bear its own litigation and administrative costs and expenses, including attorneys' fees. Related to: Order 249 . (See attached document for details.) (lom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Steadfast Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]