Barry Rosen v. eBay, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and eBay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv07531
Filed: November 16, 2007
 
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Florence-Marie Cooper
Referring Judge: Charles F. Eick
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2008 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper re Settlement of Case. Pursuant to terms of the Confidential Settlement Agreement and the Parties Stipulation filed herein, this action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to plaintiff Barry Rosen. The Court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the terms and conditions of the Confidential Settlement Agreement 20 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mg)
August 28, 2008 20 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Stipulation and Order re Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
May 1, 2008 19 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Attorney Settlement Officer Filed; Parties stipulate that MIchael A. Tomasulo may serve as Attorney Settlement Officer for an early settlement conference. Filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
April 3, 2008 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Benjamin F Chapman counsel for Defendant eBay, Inc.. Benjamin F. Chapman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant eBay, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Chapman, Benjamin)
March 31, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2009 09:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 4/21/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (ama)
March 31, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER/REFERRAL TO ADR PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper, case ordered to Attorney Settlement Officer Panel for a Local Rule 16-15 settlement conference. (ama)
March 31, 2008 15 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (ama)
March 17, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper:, re Stipulation for Hearing 13 . Scheduling Conference is continued to 3/31/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (ama)
March 13, 2008 13 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re case scheduling conference filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Case Scheduling Conference)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
March 10, 2008 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Defendant eBay, Inc.'s Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures filed by Defendant eBay, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Spieker, Meghan)
March 10, 2008 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen, Defendants eBay, Inc., Does 1 through 10.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Spieker, Meghan)
March 10, 2008 10 JOINT ADR PILOT PROGRAM QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Defendant eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Spieker, Meghan)
January 18, 2008 9 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper : Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (csl)
January 18, 2008 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. Pilot Program Questionnaire attached.(csl)
January 4, 2008 5 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING PROCEDURES FOR JUDGE COOPER by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper : SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (csl)
January 4, 2008 4 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE COOPER by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper : This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE FLORENCE-MARIE COOPER, United States District Judge. Please substitute the initials FMC in place of the initials GAF. The case number will now read: 2:07-cv-07531-FMC-Ex. Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials FMC be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (csl)
December 28, 2007 7 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant eBay, Inc.. (csi)
December 28, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint for Damages for Violation of Copyright 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant eBay, Inc..(csi) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2008 (csi, ).
November 21, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 07.02 by Judge Gary A. Feess. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Florence-Marie Cooper for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 07-7531 FMC (Ex). (rn)
November 16, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Peter R Dion-Kindem is 818-676-0246. (et)
November 16, 2007 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2007 (cbr, ).
November 16, 2007 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants eBay, Inc., Does 1 through 10. (et)
November 16, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants eBay, Inc., Does 1 through 10. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2007 (cbr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barry Rosen v. eBay, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
Represented By: Peter R Dion-Kindem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]