Glen E. Friedman v. Thierry Guetta et al Featured Case

Case Number: 2:2010cv00014
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Chooljian
Presiding Judge: Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 95 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.(Allen, Erica)
August 5, 2011 94 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). (Paper Copy Mailed to Copyright Office). (Attachments: # 1 ORDER) (sch)
August 5, 2011 93 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error PDF Document did not get attached to the entry Re Order Removing Case From Active Caseload. It is attached to this form. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (sch)
August 5, 2011 Order Removing Case From Active Caseload. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload until further application by the parties or Order of this Court. All pending trial dates and Motions in Limine are vacated by the Court. This Court retains jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(sch)
August 4, 2011 92 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Trial and Pretrial Conference Dates 91 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
August 4, 2011 91 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Trial and Pretrial Conference Dates filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gutman, Alan)
July 21, 2011 90 MINUTE: (IN CHAMBERS): COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED the FINAL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE is hereby continued from July 25, 2011 to August 8, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. In addition, the PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. ONE 68 , TWO 69 AND THREE 70 and the DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. ONE 66 , TWO 67 AND THREE 84 are continued and/or re-set to August 8, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (ir)
July 15, 2011 89 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE No. One (1) to Exclude evidence of indirect profits MOTION IN LIMINE No. One (1) to Exclude evidence of indirect profits 66 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Erica)
July 15, 2011 88 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Erica)
July 12, 2011 87 Opposition IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE No. Two (2) to Preclude argument re willful infringement MOTION IN LIMINE No. Two (2) to Preclude argument re willful infringement 67 SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
July 12, 2011 86 REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits Filed by Plaintiff 69 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
July 12, 2011 85 REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Other Photos 68 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
July 11, 2011 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. Three (3) to Exclude Evidence of Other Artworks filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Juenger, John)
July 6, 2011 83 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 76 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Statement. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 6, 2011 82 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. correcting Witness List 78 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Witness List with Corrected Title)(Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Shepard Fairey Lawsuit 70 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits Filed by Plaintiff 69 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 79 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Other Photos 68 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 78 Witness List filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta.. (Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 77 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
July 5, 2011 76 Joint Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman (Allen, Erica)
July 5, 2011 75 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.. (Allen, Erica)
July 5, 2011 74 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Allen, Erica)
July 5, 2011 73 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.. (Allen, Erica)
July 5, 2011 72 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.. (Allen, Erica)
June 27, 2011 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 2 to Preclude Argument Re: Willful Infringement filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Erica)
June 22, 2011 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Shepard Fairey Lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Erica)
June 22, 2011 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits Filed by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Erica)
June 22, 2011 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Other Photos filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Erica)
June 20, 2011 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. Two (2) to Preclude argument re willful infringement filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Guetta Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Juenger, John)
June 20, 2011 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. One (1) to Exclude evidence of indirect profits filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Guetta Declaration, # 2 Declaration Juenger Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Juenger Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Juenger, John)
May 27, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 45 AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 40 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: (lc) Modified on 6/13/2011 (lc).
May 16, 2011 64 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: REMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THIERRY GUETTA 40 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO COPYRIGHT,NONFRINGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLEN E. FRIEDMAN 45 .Court hears oral argument and takes the matters under submission.Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lc)
May 13, 2011 63 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related) 55 Objection To Declaration of John Juenger filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Linde, Douglas)
May 4, 2011 62 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THIERRY GUETTA 40 (FILED ON 04-04-11) and the MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLEN E. FRIEDMAN 45 (FILED ON 04-04-11) are hereby continued from May 9, 2011 to May 16, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (sch)
May 2, 2011 61 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant of Deposition Transcript of Glen E. Friedman re MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 49 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Portions of Deposition)(Juenger, John)
April 27, 2011 60 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting 57 plaintiffs Application to file Under Seal the non re-adacted declaration of Douglas A Linde in support of opposition to motion for summary adjudication and exhibit 5 thereto. (lc)
April 27, 2011 59 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Douglas A. Linde in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
April 27, 2011 58 SEALED DOCUMENT- Non-Redacted Declaration of Douglas A. Linde in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Ajudication. (mat)
April 25, 2011 56 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
April 25, 2011 55 REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Juenger, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Juenger, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of John Juenger)(Juenger, John)
April 22, 2011 57 APPLICATION to file under seal non re-adacted declaration of Douglas a Linde in support of opposition to motion for summary adjudication and exhibit 5 thereto filed by plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. Lodged order. (lc)
April 22, 2011 54 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman of Declaration of Douglas A. Linde and Exhibit 5. (Allen, Erica)
April 18, 2011 53 DECLARATION of DOUGLAS A. LINDE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 REDACTED filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Linde, Douglas)
April 18, 2011 52 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement Of Genuine Issues)(Linde, Douglas)
April 18, 2011 51 DECLARATION of Alan S. Gutman in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Juenger, John)
April 18, 2011 50 DECLARATION of Thierry Guetta in ppposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Juenger, John)
April 18, 2011 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Seperate Statement of Genuine Issues)(Juenger, John)
April 5, 2011 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Guetta defendants Statement (Motion related) 43 , Motion Related Document 44 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Proposed statement of uncontroverted facts and the proposed judgment, are not e-filed in themselves, but to be submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 4, 2011 47 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Linde In Support Of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 17)(Linde, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 46 DECLARATION of GLEN E. FRIEDMAN In Support Of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment 45 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Linde, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Copyright Infringment filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Linde, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 44 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Gutman, Alan)
April 4, 2011 43 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Gutman, Alan)
April 4, 2011 42 DECLARATION of Alan S. Gutman in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gutman, Alan)
April 4, 2011 41 DECLARATION of Thierry Guetta in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 40 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Gutman, Alan)
April 4, 2011 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Gutman, Alan)
March 31, 2011 39 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The Court has read and considered the Stipulation for a scheduling order regarding the parties respective motions for summary judgment 38 . Upon consideration of the stipulation, and good cause appearing therefor, that following scheduling order shall is hereby entered with respect to the parties respective motions for summary judgment: (1) The moving papers will be filed on 4/4/2011; (2) The opposition papers will be filed on 4/18/2011. (3) The reply papers will be filed on 4/25/2011; and (4) The motions (yet to be filed) shall be scheduled for 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
March 30, 2011 38 Joint STIPULATION for Order Scheduling MSJ filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order scheduling MSJ)(Juenger, John)
February 28, 2011 37 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and to Produce Documents 35 . Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing on Defendant's Motion is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. (hr)
February 15, 2011 36 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and to Produce Documents 35 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
February 8, 2011 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and to Produce Documents filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation, # 2 Declaration Declaration of John Juenger in Support of Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of John Juenger in Support of Motion to Compel, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Juenger, John)
February 2, 2011 34 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: (1) Submitting and Vacating 02/08/11 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion 29 (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca)
January 25, 2011 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents 29 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Allen, Erica)
January 21, 2011 32 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: (1) Submitting and Vacating January 25, 2011 Hearing on Defendant's Thierry Guetta's Motion to Quash; (2) Denying Defendant's Motion 26 ; and (3) Directing Clerk to Correct Docket. (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS) (kca)
January 18, 2011 31 DECLARATION of John Juenger in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents 29 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Erica)
January 18, 2011 30 DECLARATION of Aren Kavcioglu in support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents 29 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Allen, Erica)
January 18, 2011 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Allen, Erica)
January 11, 2011 28 REQUEST to Supplement To Opposition To Motion To Quash re MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Business Records 26 filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. Request set for hearing on 1/25/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Linde, Douglas)
January 11, 2011 27 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Business Records 26 filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Juenger, John)
January 4, 2011 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Business Records filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation, # 2 Declaration of John Juenger in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibits A through C to Declaration of John Juenger, # 4 Declaration of Aren Kavcioglu in Opposition to Motion, # 5 Exhibits A through C to Declaration of Aren Kavcioglu, # 6 Proposed Order)(Juenger, John)
December 28, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Discovery, 24 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Non-party Paypal, Inc. Is ordered not produce any documents responsive to the subpoena issued by Plaintiff's counsel on December 9, 2010 until Defendant's motion to quash and/or modify the subpoena is heard and the Court has issued a ruling in that regard. (hr)
December 28, 2010 24 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Subpoena for business records to non-party filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Non-Party Not to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena Until Motion to Quash is Heard)(Juenger, John)
November 17, 2010 23 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian RE: DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
November 12, 2010 22 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Juenger, John)
October 19, 2010 21 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Attorney Settlement Officer. Caroline Mankey has been assigned to serve as Attorney Settlement Officer. (mb)
October 6, 2010 20 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Attorney Settlement Officer Filed; Parties stipulate that Caroline Mankey may serve as Attorney Settlement Officer for Settlement Proceedings The Plaintiff obtained the consent of the Attorney Settlement Officer. Filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman(Allen, Erica)
August 24, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson,( Jury Trial set for 8/16/2011 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.) (sce)
August 24, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Granted the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp2). (sce)
August 23, 2010 17 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson Court sets trial dates. (Refer to the SCHEDULING ORDER to be issued hereafter.) Court Reporter: None Present. (sce)
August 12, 2010 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.. (Allen, Erica)
June 7, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/23/10 3:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of Rule 26(f) Report by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
March 18, 2010 14 ANSWER to Counter-Claim filed by Counter-Defendant Glen E. Friedman.(Allen, Erica)
March 5, 2010 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and counerclaimant Thierry Guetta, (lc) (lc).
March 5, 2010 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Glen E. Friedman filed by defendant Thierry Guetta.(lc) (lc).
March 5, 2010 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear motion date with court clerk prior to filing the motion. Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 AM. The Court requires two non-blue backed courtesy copies of only the following manual and electronic filed documents: (1) All noticed motions and related documents; and (2) All ex parte applications and related documents (3) all exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Court's General Order No. 08-02 regarding ECF Courtesy Paper Copies.] (lc)
March 5, 2010 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the document entitled ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND COUNTER-CLAIMS, filed on March 4, 2010, docket number 7 was electronically filed incorrectly and therefore ordered STRICKEN from the docket. Counsel shall review the electronic filing procedures and re-file the document forthwith. (lc)
March 5, 2010 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 7 . The following error(s) found are specified below. incorrect event and procedure. PDF is a combined Answer and an initiating document, a Counterclaim, which per G.O. 08-02, is Not permitted to be e-filed, but Manually filed with civil intake. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 4, 2010 8 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Thierry Guetta, (Gutman, Alan)
March 4, 2010 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND and Counter-Claims filed by Defendant Thierry Guetta.(Gutman, Alan) Modified on 3/5/2010 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 3/5/10)
February 4, 2010 6 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thierry Guetta answer now due 3/5/2010, filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman.(Allen, Erica)
January 20, 2010 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman, upon Thierry Guetta served on 1/14/2010, answer due 2/4/2010. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substituted service, by FRCP 4 statute, upon Debra Guetta. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons Not Returned. (Allen, Erica)
January 6, 2010 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Glen E. Friedman. (Allen, Erica)
January 4, 2010 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
January 4, 2010 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (et) (ds).
January 4, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Thierry Guetta, Does 1 through 10 inclusive. (et)
January 4, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Thierry Guetta, Does 1 through 10 inclusive. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Glen E. Friedman. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen E. Friedman v. Thierry Guetta et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]