Sachiko Muromura v. Rubin Postaer and Associates et al

Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc and Rubin Postaer and Associates
Plaintiff: Sachiko Muromura
Case Number: 2:2012cv09263
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Referring Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED 12 . Any amended complaint shall be filed within fourteen days of the date of this order. (lc). Modified on 5/31/2013 .(lc).
September 16, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 31 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed within fourteen days of the date of this order. (lc). Modified on 9/16/2014. (lc).
April 15, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 46 . The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED, with prejudice by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) . (lc) Modified on 4/15/2015 (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sachiko Muromura v. Rubin Postaer and Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin Postaer and Associates
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sachiko Muromura
Represented By: David A Makman
Represented By: Robert Craig Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.