Tyler Jenkins v. M D Biter

Petitioner: Tyler Jenkins
Respondent: M D Biter
Case Number: 2:2013cv02724
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 3 AS MODIFIED, DECLINING TO DISMISS THE PETITION, PERMITTING PETITIONER TO AMEND AND ADVISING PETITIONER THAT THE PETITION WILL BE DISMISSED IF HE FAILS TO AMEND THE PETITION BY 9/6/13 by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (See document for details). (ib)
March 31, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Adopting the 2d R&R as Supplemented; Declining to Exercise Statutory Discretion to Deny Unexhausted Claims for Lack of Merit; Directing Petitioner to Choose One of Four Options by a Date Certain on Penalty of Dismissal with Prejudic e; Requiring Respondent to Respond and Permitting Petitioner to Reply by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. No later than Monday, May 26, 2014, the respondent SHALL FILE a response. No later than Friday, June 13, 2014, petitioner MAY FILE a reply brief. (jp)
May 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 58 JUDGMENT by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank Pursuant to the Court's Order 26 issued this same date, final judgment is hereby entered in favor of respondent M.D. Biter (Warden) and against petitioner Tyler Jenkins. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler Jenkins v. M D Biter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyler Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M D Biter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]