Stephen Echols v. Morpho Detection, Inc.

Defendant: Transportation Security Agency, Janet Napolitano, Morpho Detection, Inc. and United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Stephen Echols
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv03162
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge John F. Walter. Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that Plaintiff is entitled to recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $ 3,395.00. (jp)
May 1, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/1/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/3/2013.]
December 9, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issuesbrought by Federal Defendants as against Plaintiff Stephen Echols is GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED in favor of Federal Defendants. Federal Defendants shall file a motion for an award of attorney fees and/or costs within thirty (30) days of this judgment being entered if they intend on pursuing same. Likewise, the Plaintiff shall file a motion for an award of attorney fees and/or costs under FOIA or the Privacy Act within fourteen (14) days of the judgment being entered, despite his claims being rendered moot, if he intends on pursuing same. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stephen Echols v. Morpho Detection, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Agency
Represented By: Mark R Conrad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Mark R Conrad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morpho Detection, Inc.
Represented By: L Julius M Turman
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mark R Conrad
Represented By: Terrence M Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Echols
Represented By: John Lyster Fallat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]