Michel Buchbut v. Michael Tesar et al

Defendant: Opus Bank, John Does 1-10, ABC Corporations 1-10, PLASTICORP, INC. and MICHAEL TESAR
Plaintiff: MICHEL BUCHBUT
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv03202
Filed: May 6, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Margaret M. Morrow
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court [AMENDED] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/26/2013 re Michael Tesar, Plasticorp, Inc. and ABC Corporations. (ah)
August 7, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Order to Show Cause 106 Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ah)
June 7, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/17/2013. (ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Michel Buchbut v. Michael Tesar et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opus Bank
Represented By: Louis Smith
Represented By: Robert J Herrington
Represented By: Aaron Van Nostrand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLASTICORP, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL TESAR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHEL BUCHBUT
Represented By: Joseph J Fell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]