Monica Bruce et al v. Teleflora LLC

Defendant: Teleflora LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Stubbs and Monica Bruce
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv03279
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Carla Woehrle
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Under footnote one of Defendant Teleflora, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, Teleflora states that the parties have stipulated to dismiss Counts 3 and 5 as to Plaintiff Stubbs a nd Count 4 as to Plaintiff Bruce. (Mot. 5, n.1.) Teleflora notes that "[a]s a result, Teleflora's present motion to dismiss is solely directed towards plaintiffs' UCL and CLRA claims." (Id.) It is unclear whether the stipulati on to dismiss acts to dismiss the Counts in their entirety. That is, does Stubbs still assert Count 4 and Bruce Counts 3 and 5? Therefore, the parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE to clarify this issue. The parties must file either a joint stipulation dismissing Counts 3 through 5 in their entirety, or otherwise file a joint report stating their precise positions. This stipulation or report must be filed by September 12, 2013. No hearing will be held on this matter. (jre)
September 19, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER that Telefloras Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED 25 and Plaintiffs CLRA and UCL claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Telefloras Motionto Strike is DENIED 25 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 9/19/2013 (lc).
October 3, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:the Court DENIES Plaintiffs application to file under seal.Plaintiffs application to file Exhibits 3 23 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs may reapply to file these exhibits under seal. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Application to file Exhibit 2, Exhibit 24, and the Declaration of Jordanna G. Thigpen under seal with prejudice. The Court DENIES Pl aintiffs Application to file its Memorandum of Law in Support of Class Certification under seal without prejudice. Plaintiffs may reapply to file their unredacted memorandum under seal, but Plaintiffs must also file a redacted version of the memorandum for public viewing. The redacted version of the memorandum should be edited to omit only the material that the parties believe in light of this order are truly confidential. (lc) Modified on 10/4/2013. (lc). Modified on 10/4/2013 (lc).
December 18, 2013 91 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 43 AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS 68 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc) .Modified on 12/18/2013. (lc).
June 16, 2014 97 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL 93 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice with No Conditions Attached. Plaintiffs Motion for Voluntary dismissal is GRANTED,But Plaintiffs Motion to impose no condition on that dismissal is DENIED. Teleflora, as the prevailing party, is entitled to recover its costs.Plaintiffs shall have until June 30, 2014 to accept or refuse the conditional dismissal. (lc) .Modified on 6/16/2014 .(lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monica Bruce et al v. Teleflora LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleflora LLC
Represented By: James Paul Pecht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Stubbs
Represented By: Michael T Fantini
Represented By: Sherrie R Savett
Represented By: Jordanna G Thigpen
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Bruce
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Represented By: Jordanna G Thigpen
Represented By: Sherrie R Savett
Represented By: Michael T Fantini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]