Yolanda Trotter et al v. The County of Los Angeles et al

Plaintiff: David Ezell Trotter, Yolie Perez, Oretha Trotter, Patricia A. Trotter and Yolanda Trotter
Defendant: The Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, The County of Los Angeles, Unknown Mekdara, Unknown Kneer, Joana Gomez, D. Fitzpatrick, Does, Bobby D. Denham, Glenn Brandon, Head Sheriff Leroy D. Baca and Unknown Tucker
Case Number: 2:2013cv06293
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Referring Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. On October 21, 2014, the Court granted plaintiffs Trotter and Perezs Motion for Extension of Time, and set the deadline for plaintiffs to filed a Second Amended Complaint, as required by the Courts Order Dismissing First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend, as no later than December 5, 2014. That deadline has now passed, and plaintiffs have not filed a Second Amended Complaint. Accordingly, plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, no la ter than December 17, 2014, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and follow court orders. The filing of a Second Amended Complaint on or before December 17, 2014, shall be deemed compliance with this order to show cause. (es)
January 14, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBER) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams.Accordingly, plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, no later than January 21, 2015, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and follow court orders. The filing of a Second Amended Complaint on or before January 21, 2015, shall be deemed compliance with this order to show cause. Plaintiffs are advised that the failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. *See attached Order for details.* (es)
October 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. On October 3, 2013, Yolanda Trotter ("Trotter") filed a Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees in this action. On October 11, 2013, the Court granted her Request based on the financial information contained therein. On October 18, 2013, Trotter signed a second Request, and submitted it to the Court. Trotter's responses to certain financial questions in the second Request are entirely different from the same q uestions in the first Request. Trotter signed both Requests under penalty of perjury. Accordingly, NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 29, 2013, Trotter is ordered to show cause why the Court's authorization to file this action without prepayment of the filing fees should not be withdrawn, and this action dismissed, based on her inconsistent, yet sworn, responses. Failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to follow court orders. (ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yolanda Trotter et al v. The County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ezell Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolie Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oretha Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mekdara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kneer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joana Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby D. Denham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Sheriff Leroy D. Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.