Wachovia Securities LLC Wage and Hour Litigation Featured Case

 
Case Number: 8:2007ml01807
Filed: March 1, 2007
 
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Southern Division - Santa Ana Office
County: XX US, Outside California
Referring Judge: Robert N. Block
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 103 Featured Case NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge David O. Carter, ORDERING Correspondence dated March 12, 2010 from Bridget A. Fernandez received on 3/8/2010 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: FRCvP Rule 5(d) No proof of service attached to document(s); LR 83-2.11 Parties shall refrain from communicating to the Judge in a pending matter unless opposing counsel is present. All matters shall be called to a Judge's attention by application or motion conforming with Local Rules. (lwag)
January 15, 2010 102 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/05/09 (Sutton, Jane)
January 15, 2010 101 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/05/09. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Jane Sutton Rule, phone number (714) 558-7755. Transcript may be at before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (Sutton, Jane)
January 15, 2010 100 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/05/09. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Jane Sutton Rule, phone number (714) 558-7755. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter via email at janesutton@sbcglobal.net before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (Sutton, Jane)
December 18, 2009 99 Joint STIPULATION to Continue SETTLEMENT PAYMENT DEADLINE AS TO WACHOVIA from 12/21/2009 to 12/31/2009 Re: Notice (Other) 56 filed by Attorney for Defendants Wachovia Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hix, Timothy)
November 20, 2009 98 DECLARATION of Lance P. Blair Regarding Second Supplemental CAFA Notice filed by Defendants Wachovia Securities LLC, First Union Securities, Inc.. (Almon, Lorie)
November 16, 2009 97 Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Pursuant to Rule 60(a) Correcting Judgment to Reduce the Cost Award to Class Counsel filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Justin)
October 6, 2009 95 JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED ASFOLLOWS: 1) The Court, for purposes of this Judgment and Order of Dismissal (Judgment), adopts all defined terms as set forth in the Stipulation filed in this case; 18) Subject to Court approval, Class Counsel seek reasonable attorney fees in this matter in the gross amount of $9,750,000, in addition to litigation costs in the amount of $436,661.87; the Wachovia Defendants have agreed to pay up to$295,650.09 to the Claims Administrator; and the Wachovia Defendants have agreed to pay enhancements in the total gross amount of $420,000 to the Class Representatives to reimburse them for their unique services; 20) This document shall constitute a judgment (and separate document constituting said judgment) for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (rla)
October 6, 2009 93 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected, correct event is Proof of Service (subsequent document) RE: Miscellaneous Document 89 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp)
October 5, 2009 96 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter re: 1) Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants 2) Hearing on Application for Attorney Fees, Expenses and Class Representative Enhancements. Counsel state their appearances. Court conducts hearing and grants motions. Judgment signed this date. Court Reporter: Jane Sutton. (db)
October 5, 2009 92 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Objector Gerald Rouse, re Notice of Withdrawal 91 served on 10/5/2009. (McInerney, Kevin)
October 5, 2009 91 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene 66 filed by Plaintiff Objector Gerald Rouse. (McInerney, Kevin)
October 1, 2009 90 DECLARATION of Byron Peter Kloeppel, Jr. In Support Of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Byron Peter Kloeppel Jr.)(Hix, Timothy)
September 30, 2009 89 Proof of Service re: Response in Support of Motion, 86 (Berger, Justin)
September 30, 2009 88 DECLARATION of Jeffrey G. Smith Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Smith In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Objector Gerald Rouse's September 28, 2009 Brief MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 30, 2009 87 DECLARATION of Niall McCarthy Supplemental Declaration of Niall P.McCarthy In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Objector Gerald Rouse's September 28, 2009 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 30, 2009 86 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 Plaintiffs' Response to Objector Gerald Rouse's September 28, 2009 Brief filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 30, 2009 85 Corrected NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen M Harris on behalf of Plaintiffs Jason Clark, Wayne Ribnick, David Mizrahi, Howard Schneider, Anthony San Andres, Robert Huntley, Lloyd Cohen, Stephen Pincin, Scott Dahlberg (Harris, Stephen)
September 29, 2009 84 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected: Miscellaneous; Correct specific event to add appearance of counsel is: Notice/Appearance. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought. RE: Miscellaneous Document 79 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lt)
September 28, 2009 83 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Gerald Rouse, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 81 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 82 served on 9/28/09. (McInerney, Kevin)
September 28, 2009 82 DECLARATION of Kevin J. McInerney in Opposition to Motion for Final Approval; Award of Attorney's Fees MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements 76 filed by Plaintiff Gerald Rouse. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McInerney, Kevin)
September 28, 2009 81 OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements 76 filed by Plaintiff Gerald Rouse. (McInerney, Kevin)
September 28, 2009 80 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: RESETTING HEARING Court orders the Hearing on Motion by Gerald Rouse to Intervene, presently set October 5, 2009 at 8:30 a.m., RE-SET AS TO TIME ONLY, to October 5, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this minute order on counsel for all parties in this action. (rla)
September 25, 2009 79 Appearance of Counsel (Harris, Stephen)
September 24, 2009 78 JOINDER in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 and OPPOSITION to MOTION FOR INTERVENTION filed by Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC. (Hix, Timothy)
September 21, 2009 77 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements 76 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 21, 2009 76 APPLICATION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements filed by plaintiffs Shawn P Dewane. Application set for hearing on 10/5/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Berger, Justin)
September 21, 2009 75 DECLARATION of Lance P. Blair Regarding Notice and Claims Administration in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 21, 2009 74 DECLARATION of Niall P. McCarthy in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 21, 2009 73 DECLARATION of Jeffrey G. Smith in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement 72 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
September 21, 2009 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Shawn P Dewane. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Berger, Justin)
September 18, 2009 71 Featured Case ORDER re: Filing of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement/Attorneys' fees by Judge David O. Carater. Pursuant to the parties stipulation [70, the Court hereby GRANTS the parties a one-week extension of the September 14, 2009 filing date. Accordingly, the parties shall file their motion for final approval of class action settlement, and Class Counsel will file their motion for attorneys fees, costs, and Class Representative enhancements, on or before September 21, 2009. The final approval hearing shall remain set on October 5, 2009, at 3:00 p.m. (db)
September 11, 2009 70 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Final Approval of Settlement/Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Justin)
August 28, 2009 69 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Gerald Rouse, re First MOTION to Intervene 66 , Objections - non-motion 64 served on August 28, 2009. (McInerney, Kevin)
August 26, 2009 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward J Wynne on behalf of Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane (Wynne, Edward)
August 25, 2009 67 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor-Plaintiff Gerald Rouse, re First MOTION to Intervene 66 served on August 25, 2009. (McInerney, Kevin)
August 25, 2009 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor-Plaintiff Gerald Rouse. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. McInerney)(McInerney, Kevin)
August 25, 2009 65 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Gerald Rouse, re Objections - non-motion 64 served on August 25, 2009. (McInerney, Kevin)
August 25, 2009 64 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement by Named Plaintiff Gerald Rouse (McInerney, Kevin)
July 6, 2009 63 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter CONFIRMING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST PRUDENTIAL DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS ORDERED, having already dismissed all claims alleged in the complaints against the Prudential Defendants, that the Parties need not separately apply for orders dismissing the Litigations and each of the Tag-Along Actions. See order for details (smi)
July 6, 2009 62 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by DEFENDANT Prudential Securities Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Confirming Dismissal of Claims Against Prudential Defendants With Prejudice)(Battenfeld, John)
July 2, 2009 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 60 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiff Linda Cochran, as Executrix of the Estate of John Cochran, substituted as plaintiff in place of John Cochran. (ade)
June 15, 2009 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Linda Cochran for Plaintiff John Cochran filed by plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Justin)
June 12, 2009 59 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. Notice of Change of Firm Address of the Law Offices of James V. Bashian, P.C. (Berger, Justin)
May 28, 2009 58 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough Regarding First Supplemental CAFA Notice filed by Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC. (Almon, Lorie)
May 12, 2009 56 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Shawn P Dewane. OF FILING EXECUTED COPY OF JOINT STIPULATION OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A (PART 1 OF 2), # 2 EXHIBIT A (PART 2 OF 2))(Fineman, Nancy)
May 11, 2009 57 Featured Case ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment with Prudential Defendants by Judge David O. Carter 43 . (db)
May 11, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 30 Motion for Settlement. See Document for further details. (ade)
May 6, 2009 54 DECLARATION of Jennifer M Keough in Support of Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval 30 Supplemental Declaration in Support of Final Approval of Settlement 43 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
May 6, 2009 53 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (Fineman, Nancy)
May 6, 2009 52 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 Re: Claims Admin Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- invoice)(Clapp, James)
May 6, 2009 51 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 Supplemental Submission Re: Garden City Group Fees filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 27, 2009 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 49 Declaration of Service served on 4/27/2009. (Rickert, Rachele)
April 27, 2009 49 MEMORANDUM in Support Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Rickert, Rachele)
April 22, 2009 48 DECLARATION of JENNIFER M. KEOUGH REGARDING CAFA NOTICE filed by Defendants Wachovia Securities LLC, First Union Securities, Inc., In Re: Wachovia Securities LLC Wage and Hour Litigation. (Almon, Lorie)
April 22, 2009 47 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge David O. Carter: re: MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 , Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval 30 , Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 43 ., ( Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) Court requires the parties to disclose by 5/6/09 noon the amount of the Claims Administrator's costs and expenses sought to be paid from the settlement fund. (dmjr)
April 14, 2009 46 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 45 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 44 , Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 43 served on 4/14/2009. (Rickert, Rachele)
April 14, 2009 45 DECLARATION of M. Michael Cole In Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment with Prudential Defendants Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval 30 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Rickert, Rachele)
April 14, 2009 44 MEMORANDUM in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Rickert, Rachele)
April 14, 2009 43 NOTICE Notice of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment with Prudential Defendants)(Rickert, Rachele)
April 13, 2009 42 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 41 DECLARATION of Edward J. Wynne in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 40 DECLARATION of Ryan F. Stephan in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 39 DECLARATION of Jeffrey G. Smith in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 38 DECLARATION of Kevin J. McInerney in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 37 DECLARATION of Leon Greenberg in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 36 DECLARATION of Max Folkenflik in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 35 DECLARATION of James F. Clapp in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements 33 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
April 13, 2009 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Clapp, James)
April 7, 2009 32 DECLARATION of Joseph W. Cotchett in Support of Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval 30 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
April 7, 2009 31 DECLARATION of Jeffrey G. Smith in Support of Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval 30 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Berger, Justin)
April 7, 2009 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Justin)
April 6, 2009 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File To Submit Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with the Prudential Defendants filed by Defendant Prudential Securities Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Battenfeld, John)
March 17, 2009 28 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Maria C Rodriguez counsel for In Re: Wachovia Securities LLC Wage and Hour Litigation.Maria C. Rodriguez is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC (Rodriguez, Maria)
March 13, 2009 27 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CASE SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC. (Hix, Timothy)
March 4, 2009 26 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge David O. Carter: re: ORDER CONTINUING STATUS REPORT DEADLINE AND MAINTAINING CURRENT STATUS CONFERENCE DATE. 25 Before the Court is the Plaintiffs and the Defendants Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Securities, LLC, and First Union Securities, Inc. (Wachovia) (collectively, the Parties) Joint Stipulation for Continuance of Status Report and Conference Deadlines. After considering the stipulation, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties an additional ten days, through and including March 13, 2009, to file a report regarding the status of the litigation. However, that report must be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. pacific standard time on March 13, 2009. The Court hereby DENIES the request to continue the status conference. The status conference remains set for March 16, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. (ade)
March 2, 2009 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Report/Conference from 3-3-2009 / 3-16-2009 to 3-13-2009 / 3-25-2009 filed by Attorneys for Defendants Wachovia Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hix, Timothy)
February 6, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Continuance of Status Report and Conference Deadlines as to Plaintiffs and the Wachovia Defendants 23 . Status Report due by 3/3/2009. Status Conference continued to 3/16/2009 at 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (nbo)
February 4, 2009 23 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Report and Status Conference from 2/5/09 and 2/26/09 to 3/3/09 and 3/24/09 filed by Attorneys for Defendant Wachovia Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Continuance)(Hix, Timothy)
December 18, 2008 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected, correct event is Change of Attorney Information (G-06) RE: Miscellaneous Document, 21 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp)
December 17, 2008 21 Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane Filed by Plaintiffs Jason Clark, Wayne Ribnick, David Mizrahi, Howard Schneider, Anthony San Andres, Robert Huntley, LLoyd Cohen, Stephen Pincin, and Scott Dahlberg, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated (Harris, Stephen)
December 16, 2008 20 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants 13 . 1) Court finds on a preliminary basis that the settlement (Settlement) memorialized in the Stipulation of Settlement of Claims against the Prudential Defendants (Stipulation) falls within the range of reasonableness and meets the requirements for preliminary approval. 6) Court appoints, for settlement purposes only, Plaintiffs as Class Representatives for the Class. 7) Court appoints for settlement purposes only, the law firms of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP, Dostart Clapp Gordon and Coveney LLP, and Wynne Law Firm as Class Counsel for the Class. 8) Court appoints The Garden City Group Inc as Claims Administrator. Final Approval hearing set for 4/27/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter (see Order for further details). 17) Parties are Ordered to carry out Settlement according to terms of Stipulation. (ln)
December 5, 2008 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane, re Stipulation for Settlement, 18 , Errata 17 served on 12/5/2008. (Clapp, James)
December 5, 2008 18 Corrected STIPULATION for Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Clapp, James)
December 5, 2008 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. correcting Stipulation for Settlement 12 (Clapp, James)
December 3, 2008 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 14 , Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants 13 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 15 , Stipulation for Settlement 12 served on 12/3/2008. (Clapp, James)
December 3, 2008 15 DECLARATION of James F. Clapp In Support Of Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants 13 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Clapp, James)
December 3, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants 13 filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Clapp, James)
December 3, 2008 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2008 at 05:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Clapp, James)
December 3, 2008 12 STIPULATION for Settlement of Claims Against the Prudential Defendants filed by Plaintiff Shawn P Dewane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Clapp, James)
December 1, 2008 11 CONSOLIDATED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT SOLELY AGAINST THE PRUDENTIAL DEFENDANTS filed by plaintiffs. (smi)
November 17, 2008 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge David O. Carter: Setting Status Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Report due by 2/5/2009. Status Conference set for 12/16/2008 05:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) Theparties will further appear for a status conference on February 26, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. (ade)
September 17, 2008 8 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 by Judge David O. Carter: Plaintiffs shall file and serve a consolidated complaint on or before 12/01/08. A Master File is hereby establised for the pleadings and papers filed in the Consolidated Actions, and for al other cases filed in or transferred or removed to this Court and consolidated with the Consolidated Actions. The Master File shall be denominated MDL No. 07-1807. (See document for details.) Parties shall be represented at all court appearances by lead counsel for the parties. However, if a court appearance involves only a specific individual plaintiff or defendant, then lead counsel need not appear so long as the individual party is represented in person by counsel. Personal appearance is required for all court appearances. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
September 16, 2008 9 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, DISMISSING DUPLICATE CASE: Currently pending before the Court are two cases captioned Anthony J. Mooney v. Wachovia Securities, LLC., Case Nos. 07-0417 and 07-0541. Both resulted from the transfer of Case No 06-4698 from the Northern District of Illinois at Chicago as related to the Multidistrict Litigation, In re: Wachovia Securities, LLC Wage & Hour Litigation, MDL No. 1807 DOC. The parties have already filed pleadings in Case No. 07-0541. Accordingly, Case No 07-0417 is hereby CLOSED and all filings in that case are DEEMED to have been filed in 07-0541. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla)
December 20, 2007 6 ANSWER of Defendants Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Secuirites, LLC and First Union Securities, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class and Collective Action Complaint. (smi)
November 30, 2007 5 Featured Case STIPULATED DISMISSAL AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. All claims of named plaintiff Debra M. Reda-Cappos are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Ms. Reda-Cappos is removed as a potential class representative. IT IS SO ORDERED. (nbo)
November 7, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, FURTHER REPORT RE Meet and Confer on Proposed cAse schedule and Reqeust for Additional Time for Further Meet and Confer: IT IS SO ORDERED that the parties may have up to and including 10/25/07 to file their proposed case schedule. (rla)
November 7, 2007 3 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 by Judge David O. Carter: 2) This Order shall govern the pre-trial proceedings of these MDL and coordinated actions, and all subsequent related actions, that are added-on, transferred or otherwise coordinated as part of this proceeding. 3) CONSOLIDATION: This is a set of putative class and collective actions consolidated into In re Wachovia Securities, LLC, Wage and Hour Litigation, Master case No. SACV 05-1031 DOC(RNBx), MDL No. 1807. The cases have been consolidated and are governed by this Court's order of 9/6/07. The order also governs pending subsequently filed, and transferreed related actions. 11) CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT: Plaintiffs shall file and serve a consolidated complaint pursuant to this Court's order of 9/6/07 no later than 11/5/07. (See document for further details.) (rla)
November 7, 2007 2 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: re TIME TO ANSWER, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint 65 . ORDER granting Prudential Defendants answer due 12/31/2007 by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
November 5, 2007 94 Consolidated Class and Collective Action COMPLAINT. Filed by Plaintiff's. (ade)
September 6, 2007 1 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re MOTIONS of Various Plaintiffs to Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel 37 : 1) All actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by its orders dated 9/29/06 and 1/4/07, as well as all cases currently before this Court related to the MDL Transfers, and all tag along cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes. 2) The Consolidated Action shall also include all subsequently filed related cases and tag along cases as well as all pending related cases or tag along cases. Lead Counsel appointed herein and defense counsel shall bring to the attention of the Court and the Clerk of the Court any such cases at their earliest knowledge thereof. (See document for further details.) 20) Lead Counsel and defendants counsel shall promptly meet and confer to propose a case schedule for the Court by the 30th day after the entry of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED.(rla)
March 1, 2007 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 1807, In Re: Wachovia Securities LLC Wage and Hour Litigation. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: NJ 2:06-4487, NJ 3:06-4931, NYE 2:06-1276, NYS 1:05-8852, NYS 1:06-13319,CAC SA CV 05-1031 DOC (RNBx), CV 05-7550 DOC (RNBx), CV 05-8187 DOC (RNBx). CV 05-8315 DOC (RNBx), CV 05-8370 DOC (RNBx). SA CV 06-136 DOC (RNBx), SA CV 06-722 DOC (RNBx), CV 06-8304 GAF (FMOx)(csb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2008 (jal, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wachovia Securities LLC Wage and Hour Litigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]