Jennifer Holt v. Globalinx Pet LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: Jennifer Holt
Defendant: Globalinx Pet LLC, Globalinx Corporation and Does
Case Number: 8:2013cv00041
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth. (See Order for details.) (wr)
July 30, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 27 Motion to Strike. (twdb)
January 30, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying 40 Motion to Certify Class Action (twdb)
April 15, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown by May 19, 2014, to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennifer Holt v. Globalinx Pet LLC, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Holt
Represented By: Bevin Elaine Allen
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman
Represented By: Shawn Khorrami
Represented By: Thomas E Soule
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalinx Pet LLC
Represented By: Robert L Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalinx Corporation
Represented By: Robert L Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]