Xerox Corporation v. Jeevani and Associates, Inc

Defendant: Jeevani and Associates, Inc
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00719
Filed: May 6, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Cormac J. Carney
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 16 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, in favor of Xerox Corporation against Jeevani and Associates, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that default judgment on theComplaint is entered in favor of Xerox and against Defendant, and Xerox is awarded $430,220.01 and possession of the copier/printer equipment identified as Xerox XC800, serial number WXP008158; Xerox EX1000, serial number XDA302649; and Xerox P4112CPC, serial number GYA889238. re 14 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
March 26, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER for Appearance and Examination (Enforcement of Judgment) filed by Plaintiff Xerox Corporation as to Defendant Jeevani and Associates, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 5/15/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lbe)
March 27, 2014 33 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER for Appearance and Examination (Enforcement of Judgment) filed by Plaintiff Xerox Corporation as to Defendant Jeevani and Associates, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 5/15/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lbe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Xerox Corporation v. Jeevani and Associates, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeevani and Associates, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Robert V McKendrick
Represented By: Pamela L Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]