In Re Kenny G. Enterprises, LLC

Appellant: Douglas Rotenberg and Tuong-Vy Ton
In Re: Kenny G. Enterprises, LLC
Appellee: Thomas H. Casey
 
Case Number: 8:2014cv00246
Filed: February 20, 2014
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING PENDING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL 12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 5/7/2014 (lc).
May 20, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SUPPLY MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPIES by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc). Modified on 5/21/2014. (lc).
June 24, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVERSING AND REMANDING BANKRUPTCY COURTS DECISION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II remanding case to the U. S. Bankruptcy Court Case number: 8:11-bk-24750-TA, Adversary number: 8:13-ap-01271-TA,. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (lc). Modified on 6/25/2014 .(lc).
June 24, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON APPEAL REVERSING AND REMANDING BANKRUPTCY COURTS DECISION remanding case to the U. S. Bankruptcy Court Case number: 8:11-bk-24750-TA, Adversary number: 8:13-ap-01271-TA, by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Judgment for APPELLANTS DOUGLAS ROTEN BERG and TUONG-VY TON and against APPELLEE THOMAS H. CASEY; The Court REVERSES and REMANDS the bankruptcy courts decision for further proceedings consistent with this Courts June 24, 2014 Order; and The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Related to: Order to Remand Case to Bankruptcy Court, 27 . (lc)
June 24, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REVERSING AND REMANDING BANKRUPTCY COURTS DECISION remanding case to the U. S. Bankruptcy Court Case number: No. 8:11-bk-24750-TA, Adversary number: 8:13-ap-01271-TA by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 6/26/2014 .(lc).
March 6, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ROTENBERGS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 8001(b) AND 8003 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Clerk of Court shall issue the Notice Regarding Appeal forthwith. (lc) Modified on 3/7/2014 (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In Re Kenny G. Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Douglas Rotenberg
Represented By: Tomas Andres Ortiz
Represented By: Zi Chao Lin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tuong-Vy Ton
Represented By: Tomas Andres Ortiz
Represented By: Zi Chao Lin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kenny G. Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas H. Casey
Represented By: Kathleen J McCarthy
Represented By: Thomas Harrington Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]