National Meat Association v. Brown et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: National Meat Association
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California
Intervenor Plaintiff: American Meat Institute
Case Number: 1:2008cv01963
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 112 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Andrew Lurie, PHV for The Humane Society of the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/14/11. (Hellings, J)
September 7, 2010 RECEIPT number #CAE100012212 $180.00 fbo Andrew Lurie by Peter Brandt on 9/7/2010. Pro Hac Vice Application for Attorney Andrew Lurie. (Jessen, A)
September 7, 2010 110 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Humane Society of the United States for attorney Andrew Lurie to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Brandt, Peter)
August 30, 2010 109 Featured Case ORDER Re: SUBSTITUTION Of ATTORNEYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/27/2010. Attorney Sarah L. Conant, PHV terminated; Attorney Peter A. Brandt, substituted as counsel of record. (Scrivner, E)
August 26, 2010 108 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Conant, Sarah)
May 27, 2010 107 Joint Stipulation and Order Rescheduling Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/27/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in light of the Order of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals staying the mandate pending NMAs timely petition for certiorari, the status conference scheduled for June 1, 2010 is postponed until further notice. (Arellano, S.)
May 27, 2010 106 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE by National Meat Association. (Droske, Timothy)
May 25, 2010 105 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown, 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States: Plaintiff-Appellees motion to stay the mandate pending the filing of a timely petition for certiorari is granted. See Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(2). (Bradley, A)
May 18, 2010 104 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown, 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States (The petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc is denied) (Martin, S)
March 31, 2010 103 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States; OPINION This is an interlocutory appeal from a preliminary injunction prohibiting the enforcement of California Penal Code 599f, which bans the slaughter and inhumane handling of nonambulatory animals, against federally regulated swine slaughterhouses. (Scrivner, E)
March 19, 2010 102 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Status Conference from 3/25/2010 to 6/1/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/18/2010. (Hernandez, M)
March 18, 2010 101 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Rescheduling Status Conference (Joint) by National Meat Association. (McCann, Heather)
January 25, 2010 100 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Status and/or Scheduling Conference from 1/27/2010 to 3/25/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/23/2010. (Hernandez, M)
October 27, 2009 99 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to agreement by counsel, the Status and/or Scheduling Conference IS RESET from 11/4/2009 to 1/27/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Hernandez, M)
August 27, 2009 98 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to agreement by all counsel, the Status and/or Scheduling Conference is RESET from 9/2/2009 to 11/4/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Hernandez, M)
August 6, 2009 97 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown, 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. Oral argument shall be limited to ten minutes for each side. (Sondheim, M)
May 14, 2009 96 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown, 76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. Appellant Humane Society of the United States' oral request for an extension of time to file appellants' reply in appeal no. 09-15486 is granted. Appellants reply brief in appeal no. 09-15486 is now due May 21, 2009. (Flores, E)
April 29, 2009 95 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal - ATY filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown, 76 Notice of Appeal - ATY, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States; Appellee National Meat Association's motion for an enlargement of brief size is granted. The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. (Scrivner, E)
April 2, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal, Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/1/2009. CASE STAYED. (Arellano, S.)
April 1, 2009 93 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal by National Meat Association. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order)(Droske, Timothy)
March 26, 2009 92 NOTICE of Filing Proofs of Service of Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery by National Meat Association. (Schmidt, Kent)
March 24, 2009 91 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/24/2009. The parties shall file a proposed order with the Court addressing the STAY of this action, the pending Motion to Stay Discovery and setting a status hearing. Status and/or Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Plaintiffs Counsel Steven Wells, Heather McCann, William Tarantino, Tim Droske by telephone. Defendants Counsel Susan Leach, Sarah Conant, Bruce Wagman by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Hernandez, M)
March 20, 2009 90 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by National Meat Association re 86 MOTION to STAY DISCOVERY. CERTIFICATE OF PERSONAL SERVICE (Droske, Timothy)
March 20, 2009 89 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order in pdf format; Word Perfect format emailed to Judge Beck re 86 MOTION to STAY DISCOVERY by National Meat Association. (Droske, Timothy)
March 20, 2009 88 EXHIBIT COMPENDIUM OF WESTLAW AND LEXIS UNPUBLISHED CASE AUTHORITIES CITED IN PLAINTIFF NMA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY re 86 MOTION to STAY DISCOVERY filed by National Meat Association. (Attachments: # 1 Compendium Exhibit Tab 1, # 2 Compendium Exhibit Tab 2, # 3 Compendium Exhibit Tab 3, # 4 Compendium Exhibit Tab 4)(Droske, Timothy)
March 20, 2009 87 MEMORANDUM by National Meat Association in SUPPORT of 86 MOTION to STAY DISCOVERY. (Droske, Timothy)
March 20, 2009 86 MOTION to STAY DISCOVERY by National Meat Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Droske, Timothy)
March 18, 2009 85 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal and 76 Notice of Appeal. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 09-15483 and 09-15486.These appeals are consolidated. The briefing schedule is established. If appellants fail to file timely the opening briefs, these appeal will bedismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute.(Figueroa, O)
March 17, 2009 84 [Proposed] First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by American Meat Institute.(Tarantino, William)
March 17, 2009 83 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by National Meat Association. (Attachments: # 1 NMA's Proposed Amended Complaint)(McCann, Heather)
March 16, 2009 82 NOTICE That No Transcripts Will Be Ordered for Preliminary Injunction Appeal by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Conant, Sarah)
March 13, 2009 81 NOTICE of Filing Proofs of Service of Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Meat Association. (Schmidt, Kent)
March 10, 2009 80 USCA APPEAL FEES received of *$ 455* receipt number CAE100006299 from Susan K. Leach, Deputy Attorney General on *3/10/09* re 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown. (Hellings, J)
March 10, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE100006299 $455.00 Appeal Filing Fee 75 , by State of California on 3/10/2009. (Hellings, J)
March 10, 2009 79 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re 76 Notice of Appeal - ATY, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. Filed dates for Notice of Appeal *3/6/2009*, Complaint *12/23/2008* and Appealed Order / Judgment *2/19/2009*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 3/9/2009 in the amount of $455.00* ** (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Notice, # 2 Certificate of Record) (Jessen, A)
March 10, 2009 78 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re 75 Notice of Appeal - ATY filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California, Edmund G. Brown. Filed dates for Notice of Appeal *3/6/2009*, Complaint *12/23/2008* and Appealed Order / Judgment *2/19/2009*. ** *Fee Status: Not Paid - Billed* *Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California* (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Notice, # 2 Bill, # 3 Certificate of Record) (Jessen, A)
March 9, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE100006253 $455.00 fbo Humane Society by Peter Brandt on 3/9/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
March 6, 2009 76 NOTICE of APPEAL by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund as to 71 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, Terminate Motions - O. (Attachments: # 1 Statement Representation, # 2 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Conant, Sarah)
March 5, 2009 75 NOTICE of APPEAL by Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Statement Representation, # 2 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement)(Leach, Susan)
February 24, 2009 74 OPPOSITION by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund. to Plaintiff National Meat Association's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Conant, Sarah)
February 24, 2009 73 Defendant-Intervenors ANSWER to INTERVENOR COMPLAINT of American Meat Institute by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund.(Conant, Sarah)
February 24, 2009 72 Defendant-Intervenors ANSWER to COMPLAINT of National Meat Association by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund.(Conant, Sarah)
February 19, 2009 71 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Preliminary Injunction Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/19/2009. (Kusamura, W)
February 19, 2009 70 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the thorough briefing by the parties and no request for oral argument, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is taken under submission pursuant to Local Rule 78-230(h). The hearing set for February 25, 2009 is vacated. (Kusamura, W)
February 13, 2009 69 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has now received and reviewed all briefing filed in support of and in opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction. Due to the thorough briefing by the parties, the Court does not have any unanswered questions and is ready to rule without oral argument. If counsel requires oral argument to address an issue not fully addressed in the papers on file, counsel may file a request for oral argument, detailing their specific reasons for needing oral argument. The Court will accommodate any such request, but not without knowing the purpose of argument. The request for oral argument shall be filed no later than February 18, 2009. (Rooney, M)
February 13, 2009 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States, document 46 ; motion terminated and hearing vacated; order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/13/2009. (Rooney, M)
February 12, 2009 67 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by National Meat Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Kent)
February 11, 2009 66 Featured Case ORDER Advancing Hearing Date signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/09: Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the Motion to Intervene is ADVANCED from 3/16/09 to 2/25/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2009 65 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) PLEASE DISREGARD 64 Minute Order. Reply 61 is not stricken. (Kusamura, W)
February 6, 2009 64 ***DISREGARD***MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's reply brief 61 is stricken. Plaintiff is directed to file a reply brief which complies with this Court's Standing Order Doc. 22 , no later than February 13, 2009. (Kusamura, W)
February 4, 2009 63 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff National Meat Association to 46 MOTION to INTERVENE, 49 Exhibit - R, 47 Exhibit - R,,. to Proposed Intervenor-Defendants' Declarations (McCann, Heather)
February 4, 2009 62 REPLY/RESPONSE to Defendants' Objections to Declarations by National Meat Association re 54 Objections. (McCann, Heather)
February 4, 2009 61 REPLY/RESPONSE to Defendants and Proposed Intervenor-Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Meat Association re 46 MOTION to INTERVENE, 53 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Barbara Masters, # 2 Exhibit to Supplemental Declaration of Barbara Masters)(McCann, Heather)
February 3, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER Continuing the hearing date on the Motion for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Motion Hearing currently set for 2/11/2009 has been moved to 3/16/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/2009. (Kusamura, W)
February 2, 2009 59 REPLY/RESPONSE to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Request to Participate in Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Meat Association re 57 Request - ATY, 58 Minute Order. (McCann, Heather)
February 2, 2009 58 MINUTE ORDER: Any objection to the Humane Society's request to be heard (Doc. 57) at the Preliminary Injunction hearing shall be filed no later than Thursday February 5, 2009 (Kusamura, W)
January 30, 2009 57 REQUEST for Proposed Defendant-Intervenors To Be Heard at Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Conant, Sarah)
January 29, 2009 56 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund re 46 MOTION to INTERVENE. Via Personal Service on January 27, 2009 (Wagman, Bruce)
January 29, 2009 55 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Sarah L. Conant, PHV for Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association and Animal Legal Defense Fund, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/29/09. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2009 54 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Edmund G. Brown. to Plaintiff's Declarations (Leach, Susan)
January 28, 2009 53 OPPOSITION by Edmund G. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Susan K. Leach)(Leach, Susan)
January 27, 2009 52 ANSWER to INTERVENOR COMPLAINT by Edmund G. Brown.(Leach, Susan)
January 27, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE100005798 $180.00 fbo Sarah Conant by Peter Brandt on 1/27/2009. (Sondheim, M)
January 27, 2009 50 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund for attorney Sarah Conant to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Brandt, Peter)
January 27, 2009 49 EXHIBIT 6 Declaration of Peter Brandt re 46 MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A-G Brandt Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Brandt, Peter)
January 27, 2009 48 EXHIBIT 5 Declaration of Russ Mead re 46 MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A-B Mead Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Brandt, Peter)
January 27, 2009 47 EXHIBIT 4 Declaration of Michael Greger re 46 MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Humane Farming Association, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A-B Greger Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 2 Attachments C-I Greger Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 3 Attachments J-M Greger Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 4 Attachments N-T Greger Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 5 Attachments U-AA Greger Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Brandt, Peter)
January 27, 2009 46 MOTION to INTERVENE by Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary Inc., Humane Farming Association, Animal Legal Defense Fund. Attorney Brandt, Peter Alfred added. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Intervene, # 3 Exhibit 1 Proposed Answer to Plaintiff NMA's Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 2 Proposed Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff NMA's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 5 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Nancy Perry in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 6 Attachments A-K to Perry Decl in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Brandt, Peter)
January 22, 2009 45 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Edmund G. Brown. (Leach, Susan)
January 20, 2009 44 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California.(Leach, Susan)
January 15, 2009 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Meat Institute. Arnold Schwarzenegger served on 1/7/2009, answer due 1/27/2009. (Tarantino, William)
January 15, 2009 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Meat Institute. State of California served on 1/7/2009, answer due 1/27/2009. (Tarantino, William)
January 15, 2009 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Meat Institute. Edmund G. Brown served on 1/7/2009, answer due 1/27/2009. (Tarantino, William)
January 15, 2009 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by National Meat Association. State of California served on 12/30/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
January 15, 2009 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by National Meat Association. Arnold Schwarzenegger served on 12/30/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
January 15, 2009 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by National Meat Association. Edmund G. Brown served on 12/30/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
January 9, 2009 37 Featured Case ORDER on Exparte Application to extend the hearing date on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing currently set for 1/16/2009 has been moved to 2/11/2009 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/9/2009. (Kusamura, W)
January 9, 2009 36 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff National Meat Association to 33 Ex Parte Application,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven J. Wells, # 2 Declaration of Kent J. Schmidt, # 3 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Extend the Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Heather)
January 8, 2009 35 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Any opposition to the ex parte application for an extension of the hearing date (Doc. 33) shall be filed no later than 1:00 p.m. PST on Friday, January 9, 2009 (Kusamura, W)
January 8, 2009 34 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Extend the Preliminary Injunction hearing Date by Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California. (Leach, Susan)
January 8, 2009 33 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California for Extension of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date by Defendants Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger, Attorney General Edmund G. Brown Jr. and State of California. Attorney Leach, Susan K. added. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan K. Leach in support of Ex Parte, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte)(Leach, Susan)
January 6, 2009 32 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *William F. Tarantino* *Morrison and Foerster* *425 Market Street, Suite 3500* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Martin, S)
January 5, 2009 31 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by American Meat Institute.(Tarantino, William)
January 5, 2009 30 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Intervene signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/5/2009. (Martin, S)
December 31, 2008 29 STATEMENT of National Meat Association in Response to Ex Parte Application of American Meat Institute by Plaintiff National Meat Association re 7 Intervenor Complaint, 5 MOTION to INTERVENE. (Schmidt, Kent)
December 31, 2008 28 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by National Meat Association re 19 Summons, 20 AMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, 1 Complaint. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
December 31, 2008 27 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by National Meat Association re 18 Summons, 20 AMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, 1 Complaint, 17 Summons. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
December 31, 2008 26 NOTICE of Errata re: Pro Hac Vice Applications by National Meat Association re 25 Pro Hac Vice Order, 24 Pro Hac Vice Order, 23 Pro Hac Vice Order. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
December 31, 2008 25 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/30/2008. Attorney Heather M. McCann added PHV for American Meat Institute and National Meat Association. (Lundstrom, T)
December 31, 2008 24 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/30/2008. Attorney Steven J. Wells added PHV for American Meat Institute and National Meat Association. (Lundstrom, T)
December 31, 2008 23 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/30/2008. Attorney Timothy J. Droske added PHV for American Meat Institute and National Meat Association. (Lundstrom, T)
December 31, 2008 22 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2009 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Attachments: # 1 LJO Standing Order, # 2 Consent Forms) (Scrivner, E)
December 30, 2008 RECEIPT number #CAE100005518 $540.00 Pro Hac Vice Application Fees for Steven J. Wells, Timothy Droske and Heather McCann, by Zachary Bulthuis on 12/30/2008. (Hellings, J)
December 30, 2008 20 AMENDED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION amending 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by National Meat Association. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2009 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order granting Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Declaration of Schmidt in support of motion, # 4 Exhibit Schmidt Declaration Exhibits 1-5, # 5 Declaration of Carpenter in support of motion, # 6 Declaration of Goodner in support of motion, # 7 Declaration of Masters in support of motion, # 8 Declaration of Terrill in support of motion)(Schmidt, Kent)
December 30, 2008 19 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arnold Schwarzenegger* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kent Jeffrey Schmidt* *Drosey & Whitney LLP* *38 Technology Drive, Suite 100* *Irvine, CA 92618*. (Scrivner, E)
December 30, 2008 18 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *State of California* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kent Jeffrey Schmidt* *Drosey & Whitney LLP* *38 Technology Drive, Suite 100* *Irvine, CA 92618*. (Scrivner, E)
December 30, 2008 17 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edmund G. Brown* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kent Jeffrey Schmidt* *Drosey & Whitney LLP* *38 Technology Drive, Suite 100* *Irvine, CA 92618*. (Scrivner, E)
December 26, 2008 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by National Meat Association for attorney Heather McCann to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Schmidt, Kent)
December 26, 2008 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by National Meat Association for attorney Timothy Droske to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Schmidt, Kent)
December 26, 2008 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by National Meat Association for attorney Steven J. Wells to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Schmidt, Kent)
December 24, 2008 13 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/24/2008 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 9. (Attachments: # 1 LJO Standing Order, # 2 Consent to Magistrate, # 3 VDRP) (Scrivner, E)
December 24, 2008 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arnold Schwarzenegger* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *William F Tarantino* *Morrison and Foerster* *425 Market Street, Suite 3500* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Scrivner, E)
December 24, 2008 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *State of California* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *William F Tarantino* *Morrison and Foerster* *425 Market Street, Suite 3500* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Scrivner, E)
December 24, 2008 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edmund G. Brown* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *William F Tarantino* *Morrison and Foerster* *425 Market Street, Suite 3500* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Scrivner, E)
December 24, 2008 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by American Meat Institute re 5 MOTION to INTERVENE. (Tarantino, William)
December 24, 2008 8 PROPOSED ORDER re 5 MOTION to INTERVENE. (Tarantino, William)
December 24, 2008 7 EX PARTE INTERVENOR COMPLAINT by American Meat Institute.(Tarantino, William)
December 24, 2008 6 DECLARATION of William F. Tarantino in SUPPORT OF 5 MOTION to INTERVENE. (Tarantino, William)
December 24, 2008 5 MOTION to INTERVENE by American Meat Institute. (Tarantino, William)
December 23, 2008 3 NOTICE of Claim of Unconstitutionality per LR 24-132(b) by National Meat Association. Attorney Bulthuis, Zachary Anjou added. (Bulthuis, Zachary)
December 23, 2008 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by National Meat Association. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Schmidt Declaration in Support of Motion for PI, # 4 Exhibit Schmidt Declaration Exhibits 1-5, # 5 Declaration Goodner Declaration in Support of Motion for PI, # 6 Declaration Masters Declaration in Support of Motion for PI, # 7 Declaration Carpenter Declaration in Support of Motion for PI, # 8 Declaration Terrill Declaration in Support of Motion for PI)(Schmidt, Kent)
December 23, 2008 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against all defendants by National Meat Association. Attorney Schmidt, Kent Jeffrey added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmidt, Kent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Meat Association v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Meat Association
Represented By: Kent Jeffrey Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: American Meat Institute
Represented By: William F Tarantino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]