Robert W. Washington v. D. G. Adams

Petitioner: Robert W. Washington
Respondent: D. G. Adams
Case Number: 1:2009cv01801
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time (Filing Deadline: 5/15/2010) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 13, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to GRANT Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Petition 9 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Lodged Addendum to Pending Habeas Corpus Issues 10 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Filed Addendum on Respondent 10 ; ORDER DIRECTIN G Respondent to File Supplemental Response to Filed Addendum Within Sixty Days; ORDER GRANTING Respondent's Motion to File Sur-Reply 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/10: Motion to Dismiss/Answer due by 11/15/2010. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 35 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER Granting Petitioner's 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/18/2011. (Flores, E)
February 27, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 1 Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
October 19, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Robert W. Washington signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/2009. (Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert W. Washington v. D. G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert W. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.