Matthews v. People of the State of California et al

Petitioner: Ivan Lee Matthews
Respondent: People of the State of California and Darell Adams
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv02194
Filed: December 17, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/10/2010 denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment by Petitioner and granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc to July 14, 2010. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and CLOSE File; ORDER DECLINING TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 29, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 27 Motion to Correct Error signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER Denying 29 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/13. (Verduzco, M)
January 4, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/10. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Matthews v. People of the State of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan Lee Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darell Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]