Weco Supply Company, Inc. v. The Sherwin-Williams Company

Plaintiff: Weco Supply Company, Inc.
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Cross Claimant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Cross Defendant: Weco Supply Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00171
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First amended Complaint 21 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/22/2010. (Defendants motion to strike is DENIED; Plaintiffs first amended complaint is ORDERED FILED; Defendant shall have thirty (30) days to respond to the amended complaint.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 23, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to extend Defendant's time to file answer to First Amended Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/22/2010. ( Filing Deadline: 1/7/2011) (Figueroa, O)
February 2, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED Confidentiality Agreement and Protective ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
April 15, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 19, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED Amendment to Scheduling Conference Order; ORDER - Discovery by 1/15/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/31/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/28/2012. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is continued from 12/13/2011 before Judge Snyder to May 3 , 2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 5/25/2012 at 08:30 AM and JURY TRIAL set for 7/9/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/2011. (Herman, H)
April 17, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of April 23, 2012 and Taking Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Reconsideration Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/17/2012. (Scheduled motion hearing date of 4/23/2012 is hereby VACATED, and the parties shall not appear at that time. As of 4/23/2012, the Court will take the matter under submission and will thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 24, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2012. (Jessen, A)
May 8, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING the hearing on defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, document 47 , currently noticed for hearing on 5/14/2012, and deeming the matter suitable for decision without oral argument and taking it under submission as of said date; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/2012. (Rooney, M)
May 14, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Pretrial Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/11/2012. Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/8/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
May 25, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on motions for summary judgment. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/12. (Nazaroff, H)
June 1, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule On Summary Judgment And Continuing Pre-Trial Conference And Trial Dates, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2012. (Defendant's Supplemental Deadline: 6/15/2012, Plaintiff's Reply Brie f due by 7/6/2012, Plaintiff's Opposition/Non-Opposition due by 6/29/2012, Jury Trial set for 10/10/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii)(Fahrney, E)
August 7, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Supplemental Motion For Summary Judgment 47 70 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/6/2012. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Summary judgment on the First Amended Complaints Sixth Cause of Action for breach of the implied contra ct of good faith and fair dealing is GRANTED in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 2. Summary judgment on the First Amended Cross-Complaints First Cause of Action is GRANTED in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 3. Sherwin-Williams shall file proof of its damages, f ees, costs, and interest at the legal rate under Ohio law, along with a proposed order within twenty (20) days of service of this order. Weco shall file its objections, if any, within ten (10) days of service of Sherwin-Williams proposed order. The Court will thereafter enter a final award of damages in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 4. The pretrial conference and trial dates are hereby VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
October 5, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating October 15, 2012 Hearing Date and Taking Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees Under Submission 74 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/12. (Gonzalez, R)
January 3, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 74 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; JUDGMENT AND COSTS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 11, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Defendant's 82 Request for Clarification, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/11/2013. (Figueroa, O)
February 21, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING April 1, 2013 hearing date and order for expedited briefing, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/2013. (Sherwin Williams opposition or notice of non-opposition Deadline: 2/28/2013; Weco Reply due by 3/7/2013)(Figueroa, O)
March 4, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2013. (Kusamura, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weco Supply Company, Inc. v. The Sherwin-Williams Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weco Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Laird
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Joseph C Owens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Joseph C Owens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Weco Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Laird
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]