Tkac v. Anderson, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Steven Tkac
Defendant: Arthur Anderson, Jr., A. Guzman, James D. Hartley, Martin Hoshino, A. Lloren, N. Lopez, Bill McCollough, Rosemary Ndoh, E. Quezada and Philip S. Reiser
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01043
Filed: June 10, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Include Additional Documents as Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/06/2010. (Flores, E)
October 26, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint, WITH LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/26/2011. (Attachment: # 1 1983 Amended Complaint Form). (Marrujo, C)
December 14, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Under Section 1983, With Leave to File a Habeas Petition 14 , ORDER for This Dismissal To Be Subject to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/14/11. CASE CLOSED. (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Form)(Gonzalez, R)
January 20, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/20/2012. (Fahrney, E)
March 23, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER regarding 19 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/23/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Amend Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/13/2010. Amended Complaint due by 8/18/2010.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tkac v. Anderson, Jr. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Tkac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Anderson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Guzman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lloren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill McCollough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Ndoh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Quezada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip S. Reiser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]