Whitney v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Joel P. Whitney
Defendant: J. Walker, Ellen Greenman, MD, Donald B. McElroy, M. Boparai, S. Malogi, RN and G. Campbell, MD
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01963
Filed: October 20, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff either to File Second Amended Complaint or NOTIFY Court of Willingness to Proceed only on Claims Found to be Cognizable; Response Due within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/6/2011. Second Amended Complaint or Notification due by 6/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT For Failure To State A Claim WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (Doc. 12 ), Response Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/13/2011. Second Amended Complaint due by 11/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Amende Complaint Form and Instructions)(Fahrney, E)
February 3, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER DISREGARDING 8 Plaintiff's April 21, 2011 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/3/2012. (Jessen, A)
March 15, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Hartley and Claim From Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/15/2012. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER Denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without Prejudice; ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/27/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 19, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Copy of Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/19/2012. (Marrujo, C)
February 25, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and DISMISSING Action 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/25/13: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice; All other pending motions are denied as moot; and The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED ) (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER Regarding 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/22/2011. Plaintiff will be required to file his amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Whitney v. Walker et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel P. Whitney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Greenman, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B. McElroy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Boparai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Malogi, RN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Campbell, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]