Barbosa v. Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.

Plaintiff: Patricia Aguillera Barrios and Christina Barbosa
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00275
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. 1) Any motions or stipulations requesting leave to amend the pleadings must be filed no later than January 6, 2012; 2) The parties are ordered to exchange the initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) (1) on or before D ecember 6, 2011; 3) Discovery shall be completed by no later than December 7, 2012; 4) The motion for class certification shall be filed by no later than January 28, 2012; 5) Any opposition shall be filed by no later than February 25, 2013; 6) Any re ply briefs shall be filed by no later than March 11, 2013; 7) The motion for class certification shall be heard by no later than April 3, 2013, at 8:15 a..m. before the Honorable District Judge Lawrence ONeill in Courtroom 4. A status conference is set for July 17, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto in Courtroom 7. The parties may make telephonic appearances for the status conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/10/2011. (Timken, A)
July 11, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Class Certification Motion Schedule by Two Months. Fact discovery deadline shall be February 7, 2013; Motion for class certification shall be filed by March 28, 2013; Oppositions to the m otion for class certification shall be filed by April 25, 2013; Any reply brief in support of the motion for class certification shall filed by May 10, 2013; and the motion for class certification shall be heard no later than June 3, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2012. (Timken, A)
July 12, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on request for stipulated protective order. The parties' stipulated request for a protective order 27 is DENIED without prejudice to renewing the request. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2012. (Timken, A)
July 30, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/27/2012. (Timken, A)
September 13, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT and ORDER. The Status Conference currently set for 9/18/2012, is CONTINUED to 10/18/2012, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/13/2012. (Timken, A)
October 12, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re JOINT STATUS REPORT. The Status Conference currently set for 10/18/2012, is CONTINUED to 11/16/2012, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/12/2012. (Timken, A)
January 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 Preliminary approval of class action settlement; Conditionally certifying settlement class; Approving class notice and related materials; Appointing class representatives and class counsel; Appointing settlement administrat or; and requiring parties to submit proposed implementation schedule. Within two (2) days from the date of this order, the parties shall file a proposed implementation schedule with confirmed deadlines in accordance with the terms of the parties S ettlement Agreement. The Court will provide the date for the filing of the motion for final class settlement approval and will set the hearing date on that motion once the parties submit their proposed implementation schedule. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/16/2013. (Timken, A)
January 16, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Documentation in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and motion for attorneys' fees. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/16/2013. (Timken, A)
January 22, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re IMPLEMENTATION SCHEDULE. Class List to the Claims Administrator: January 30, 2013; Class Counsel's Changes, if any, to Class List: February 6, 2013; CAFA Notice Sent by Claims Administrator: February 6, 2013; Class Notice and Claim For m Mailed to Class Members: February 13, 2013; Last Day to File Objections and Opt-Out Notices: April 15, 2013; Last Day to Submit Claim: April 15, 2013; Last Day to File Response to Objections (if any): April 30, 2013; Attorneys Fees Motion Filed: Ma y 1, 2013; Last Day to File Motion for Final Approval of Settlement: May 1, 2013; Report on Settlement Administration: May 1, 2013; Final Approval Hearing and Fee Approval Hearing set for 6/5/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistra te Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Deposit of Settlement Funds with the Claims Administrator: 7 days after Effective Date; Payment of Attorneys Fees: 10 days after Effective Date; Payments of Claims to Eligible Class Members and Representative Plaintiffs: 10 days after Effective Date; Plaintiffs file a Satisfaction of Judgment or any other pleadings that may be required to conclude the Case: 90 days after Effective Date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/22/2013. (Timken, A)
May 3, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Joint Request for Extension of Time to File Final Approval Motions; ORDER for Supplemental Statement. Plaintiffs are to submit a statement regarding the applicability of the U.S. Supreme Court's recent decision in Comcast Corp. v. Beh rend, 133 S.Ct. 1426 (Mar. 27, 2013) to the certification of the settlement class in this case. This statement may be included in the motion for final approval, or it may be filed on or before May 15, 2013, as a supplemental statement in support of the motion for final approval of class settlement. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2013. (Timken, A)
May 30, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Documentation to support motion for attorneys' fees. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/30/2013. (Timken, A)
July 2, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 62 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; ORDER GRANTING 63 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Enhancement Awards. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/1/2013. (Timken, A)
January 9, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT and Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/08/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 14, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/14/11. Attorney Phillip A. Downey added for Christina Barbosa.(Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa v. Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Aguillera Barrios
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Barbosa
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Wilson
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Philip A. Downey, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.
Represented By: Jason Eric Barsanti
Represented By: Jesse Michael Caryl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]