Quady Winery Inc. v. Freixenet America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Quady Winery Inc.
Defendant: Freixenet America, Inc., Freixenet USA, Inc. and Freixenet, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01474
Filed: September 1, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Stipulation and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines: 1) Defendants Freixent America, Inc., Freixenet USA, Inc. Freixenet S.A. response to the complaint extended f rom 1/23/2012 to February 23, 2012; 2) Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 2/6/2012 to March 7, 2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully p repared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in WordPerfect or Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2012. (Herman, H)
April 6, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Settlement: parties to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety by 4/25/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/5/2012. (Herman, H)
June 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/1/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2011. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quady Winery Inc. v. Freixenet America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quady Winery Inc.
Represented By: Raffi Vaheh Zerounian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freixenet America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freixenet USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freixenet, S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]