Nemesis Air Racing, Inc. v. Remos Aircraft Inc.

Defendant: Remos Aircraft Inc.
Plaintiff: Nemesis Air Racing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01490
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO DISMISS ACTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 20, 2011. (Munoz, I)
January 17, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/2012. (Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2012) (Figueroa, O)
January 25, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to DISMISS and to CLOSE Action signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/25/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2011. (Herman, H)
November 18, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after Settlement, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/18/2011. (Kusamura, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemesis Air Racing, Inc. v. Remos Aircraft Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remos Aircraft Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nemesis Air Racing, Inc.
Represented By: David A Berstein
Represented By: Eric John Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]