United States of America v. 1.73 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County, State of California et al

Defendant: Unknown Owners, Success Mutual Water Company, A California Corporation, Success Development Company, A California Corporation, Rick R. Alba and Patricia J. Alba, Husband and Wife as Joint Tenants and 1.73 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County, State of California
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01492
Filed: August 31, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:11-CV-2315 WBS DAD) to Fresno (1:11-CV-1492 AWI MJS) signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/2/2011. (Marciel, M)
September 9, 2011 16 Featured Case APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/9/2011. (Yu, L)
September 12, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Provident Mortgage Corporation Based Upon Disclaimer, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/9/2011. (Jessen, A)
September 13, 2011 26 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Randall Carroll Based Upon Disclaimer, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/13/2011. (Jessen, A)
September 13, 2011 27 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Rita A. Woodard, Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector Based Upon Disclaimer, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/13/2011. (Jessen, A)
September 13, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING Disbursement of $185,000 as Just Compensation to Rick R. Alba and Patricia J. Alba, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/13/2011. (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2011 37 Featured Case AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/26/2011. (Yu, L)
September 29, 2011 38 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendants Rosedale Water Company signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2011. Rosedale Water Company, A California Corporation terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2011 39 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL of Defendant Carl Adair Brown signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2011. Carl Adair Brown terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion for Entry of Final Order as to Just Compensation and for Entry of Final Judgment; Order VACATING hearing date of March 26, 2012, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2012. (Figueroa, O)
March 23, 2012 50 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT in Eminent Domain, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2012. Judgment shall be, and is hereby, entered against the United States of America in the amount of $185,000; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter satisfaction of final judgment as to Defendants Rick R. Alba and Patricia J. Alba. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2012 51 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT in Eminent Domain, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2012. Judgment shall be, and is hereby, entered against the United States of America in the amount of $185,000; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter satisfaction of final judgment as to Defendants Rick R. Alba and Patricia J. Alba. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 1.73 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County, State of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Mutual Water Company, A California Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Development Company, A California Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick R. Alba and Patricia J. Alba, Husband and Wife as Joint Tenants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.73 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County, State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Trinka Ernce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]