Miller v. Schmitz et al

Defendant: Steven John Schmitz, Ronald Silva and City of Hanford
Plaintiff: Isaac Miller
Counter_claimant: Ronald Silva
Counter_defendant: Isaac Miller
Case Number: 1:2012cv00137
Filed: January 29, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULING ON THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORMS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 14, 2013. (Munoz, I)
November 14, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES' PROPOSED VOIR DIRE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 14, 2013. (Munoz, I)
December 2, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dated *12/2/2013* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants pursuant to jury verdict and court order, Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED (Gaumnitz, R)
March 19, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, document 10 ; case management deadline set for 3/29/2012 for receipt of same; order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/19/2012. (Hernandez, M)
January 8, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 117 Motion For Prejudgment Interest, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/8/2014. (The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for prejudgment interest in the amount of $861.91.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 13, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Appove Security and to Stay Execution of Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/14. (Marrujo, C)
January 17, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING Defendants' Motion to Approve its Security and to STAY Execution of Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/14. (Hellings, J)
February 18, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL 137 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 18, 2014. (Munoz, I)
February 18, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES 135 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 18, 2014. (Munoz, I)
February 18, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 18, 2014. (Munoz, I)
March 21, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH (Docs. 167 , 169 , 172 , 175 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2014. (Arellano, S.)
April 29, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion for Relief From Judgment 135 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/28/14. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DENYING Defendants' anti-SLAPP 13 Motion to Strike; ORDER for Plaintiff to File and Serve any Amended Complaint he Elects to Submit on or before May 29, 2012 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/7/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
May 23, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/23/2012. (Initial Disclosures: 6/29/2012, Discovery Deadline: 4/26/2013, Non-Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/1/2013, Non-Dispositive Motions Hearing date: 5/24/ 2013, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/4/2013, Dispositive Motions Hearing date: 7/30/2013, Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck, Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, and Jury Trial (7-8 Day Est) set for 11/19/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 22, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT Pursuant to Stipulation in Favor of Plaintiff Isaac Miller and Against Defendant Ronald Silva, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/22/13: This Court ENTERS partial judgment pursuant to the parties' stipulation. The Clerk is directed not to close this action. (Hellings, J)
May 7, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER RE Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Defendants Hanford Police Officer Steve Schmitz and the City of Hanford; Order approving Stipulation and VACATING 5/22/2013 hearing date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/6/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 6, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 52 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 6, 2013. (Munoz, I)
October 10, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DISREGARD***ORDER Re 68 Stipulations Re: Trial Evidence, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/10/2013. (Gaumnitz, R) Modified on 10/10/2013 (Amended Order 70 filed) (Gaumnitz, R).
October 10, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 69 Order Re 68 Stipulations Re: Trial Evidence, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/10/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 23, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on the Parties' 65 66 67 Motions In Limine, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 13, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST (Doc. 93) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 13, 2013. (Munoz, I)
November 14, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 95 Plaintiff's Request to Modify the Pretrial Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/13/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Schmitz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven John Schmitz
Represented By: Ryan D. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Silva
Represented By: Michael Richard Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hanford
Represented By: Ryan D. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Miller
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ronald Silva
Represented By: Michael Richard Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Isaac Miller
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]