Stimmell, et al. v. Harris, et al.

Plaintiff: Alan Stimmell and Pamela Stimmell
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris, Juan Morris, Frank Navarro, Luke Powell and Other Unknown State Agents
Case Number: 1:2012cv00155
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Mandatory Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 4/24/12 to May 8, 2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Confer ence Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in WordPerfect or Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/11/2012. (Herman, H)
June 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Kamala Harris and Fifth Claim signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/20/2013. Kamala D. Harris Terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
July 18, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Settlement Conference: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is set for August 8, 2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/2013. (Herman, H)
August 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO PRODUCE WITNESSES AT TRIAL and ORDER THEREON signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 6, 2013. (Munoz, I)
October 30, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DENY NEW TRIAL 63 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 30, 2013. Motion Hearing currently set for 11/5/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
November 21, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO CHALLENGE AWARDED COSTS 66 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 21, 2013. Motion hearing currently set for 12/4/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stimmell, et al. v. Harris, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Stimmell
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stimmell
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Morris
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Navarro
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Powell
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown State Agents
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]