Coach, Inc. et al v. Sac A Main, et al

Defendant: Dana Lanthier and Sac A Main
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00840
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Calaveras
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Judgment be entered in this action against Defendants; that an injunction issue permanently restraining Defendants from the use of any of Plaintiffs registered marks; that Plaintiffs be awarded costs and attorneys fees; and that Plaintiffs be awarded statutory benefits in an amount to be determined following Plaintiffs submission of facts and rationale forming the basis for the request for $100,000 statutorydamages; re 15 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc., 1 Complaint filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/6/2012. Objections to F&R due by 12/10/2012 (Martin-Gill, S)
December 13, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 18 Findings and Recommendations Recommending the Grant of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 15 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/13/12. (Gonzalez, R)
January 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Injunctive Relief and Setting Stautory Damages, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/13. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Sac A Main, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Lanthier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sac A Main
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Herbert Blakely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Herbert Blakely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]