Kilgore v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al

Defendant: Fred Lacker, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Regional Trustee Services Corporation and Emmitt Lewis
Plaintiff: Marsha Kilgore
Case Number: 1:2012cv00899
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending the Court's ruling on defendants' Motion to Dismiss and ORDERING the Show Cause hearing currently set for 7/2/2012 VACATED; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/29/2012. (Rooney, M)
July 20, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of July 23, 2012 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/12. (Nazaroff, H)
July 31, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESTRAINING ANY FORECLOSURE SALE FOR TEN DAYS, ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISSS, AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF TEN DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/12. (Nazaroff, H)
August 10, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF UNTIL AUGUST 17, 2012 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. ORDER RESTRAINING ANY FORECLOSURE SALE UNTIL AUGUST 20, 2012 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/10/12. (Nazaroff, H) Modified on 8/10/2012 (Nazaroff, H).
October 11, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of 10/15/12 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/11/12. (Nazaroff, H)
January 7, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY; ORDER STAYING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER to Demonstrate Standing; Case stayed, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/4/13. (January 15, 2013 Scheduling Conference is VACATED) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 6, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Lifting Stay; ORDER Denying 53 Letter of Protest, Which Has Been Termed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/3/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 24, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Dismissing Action, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/23/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 23, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 60 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/22/14. (Gonzalez, R)
June 13, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Granted; ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/13/12. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2012 at 10:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilgore v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Lacker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Adam Daluiso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmitt Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Kilgore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]