Rivera v. Primary Financial Services, LLC

Defendant: Primary Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Alphonso Rivera
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01205
Filed: July 23, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Preliminary Scheduling ORDER: (1) 6/28/2013 deadline to complete non-expert discovery pertaining to the proposed class; (2) 7/31/2013 deadline to file and serve moving papers on class certification; (3) 8/16/2013 deadline to file and serve oppositio n papers on class certification; (4) 8/30/2013 deadline to file and serve reply papers on class certification; (5) Hearing on September 13, 2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/14/2013. (Herman, H)
June 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order modifying preliminary scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/13/2013. ( Non Expert Discovery Pertaining to the Proposed Class due by 8/27/2013; Motions for Class Certification filed by 9/30/2013; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification Deadline: 10/15/2013; Replies due by 10/29/2013; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 11/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Figueroa, O)
October 11, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Settlement 17 : this Court ORDERS the parties, no later than November 1, 2013, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/11/2013. (Herman, H)
November 6, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/05/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rivera v. Primary Financial Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Financial Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Rivera
Represented By: Shehnaz M. Bhujwala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]