United States of America v. Approximately $38,474.56 seized from United Security Bank account number 10101476

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $38,474.56 seized from United Security Bank account number 10101476
Claimant: Ethele Barron and EB Preferred Property Management Real Estate Brokers Trust
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01271
Filed: August 3, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 12 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 9 Ex Parte Application for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/4/2012. Objections to F&R's due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation.(Martinez, A)
December 19, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 27, 2012 15 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT and FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE dated *12/27/2012* signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/27/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $38,474.56 seized from United Security Bank account number 10101476
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $38,474.56 seized from United Security Bank account number 10101476
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ethele Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: EB Preferred Property Management Real Estate Brokers Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]