AGCS Marine Insurance Company v. Shredall, Inc.

Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Shredall, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01935
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to disclose expert witness information. It is hereby ordered that the pretrial scheduling order deadline to disclose expert witness information is extended from 8/13/2013 to 10/1/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 8/1/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Judgment on Stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for appearance and examination of judgment debtor Shredall, Inc. The Court sets a hearing for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/25/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 15, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING request for continuance of debtor's exam, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/2014. (Debtor's Exam previously set for 10/29/2014 has been CONTINUED to 12/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone)(Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGCS Marine Insurance Company v. Shredall, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis A. Cammarano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shredall, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius John Callahan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]