United States of America v. Hampton

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Linda J Hampton
Case Number: 1:2012cv01984
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Hearing and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE: as to Respondent Linda J. Hampton - Show Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Show Cause Response due 25 days from date of this Order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/2013. (Herman, H)
March 4, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re: Petition for Judicial Approval of Levy on Principal Rsidence. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14 days from service of the findings and recommendations. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/1/2013. (Herman, H)
March 27, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/27/2013 adopting in full 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Lundstrom, T)
October 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Close Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda J Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.