Suarez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Amelia Suarez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00198
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to File His Brief: Defendant shall have a 30-day extension, or until 12/16/2013, in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2013. (Herman, H)
January 8, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (re 22 Stipulation) Extending Briefing Schedule: Plaintiff has until 1/24/2014 to file reply brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/8/2014. (Herman, H)
January 23, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING this action back to Commissioner for further administrative proceedings consistant with this opinion and Closing this action; ORDERED that Plainitiff's appeal from the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/23/2015. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
April 6, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 (Doc. 26 Stipulation): that fees and expenses in the amount of $6,000.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and costs in the amount of $22.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2015. (Herman, H)
March 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/13. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Suarez
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]