High Tech Pet Products, Inc. v. Shenzhen Jianfeng Electronic Pet Product Co., Ltd. et al

Defendant: Hongming Tang, Shenzhen Jianfeng Electronic Pet Product Co., Ltd. and Velly Wei
Plaintiff: High Tech Pet Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00242
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT: Hongming Tang/ORDER thereon, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/23/2013. Hongming Tang terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 24, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Scheduling Conference set for July 25, 2013 is VACATED and a Status Conference is set for September 19, 2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/23/2013. (Yu, L)
March 6, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding 19 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/6/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 16, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference from May 16, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. to July 25, 2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/15/2013. (Yu, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Tech Pet Products, Inc. v. Shenzhen Jianfeng Electronic Pet Product Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hongming Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Jianfeng Electronic Pet Product Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velly Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Tech Pet Products, Inc.
Represented By: James C Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.