Dixon v. The State of California et al

Defendant: Barbara Ann Neu, The State of California, Rigoberto Fernandez Jimenez, Young's Commercial Transfer, Inc., Jimenez Trucking, BNSF Railway Company, The State of California Department of Transportation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Mageela Dixon
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00244
Filed: February 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendants State of California (a government entity) and Department of Transportation (a government entity) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 18, 2013 34 Featured Case STIPULATION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, and ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/18/2013. (Martinez, A)
March 26, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/26/2014. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 4/17/2014.(Martinez, A)
May 19, 2014 43 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of This Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order and for Failure to Prosecute; Objections, if Any, Due no Later Than June 13, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/2014. The Scheduling Conference set for May 22, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED.(Martinez, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dixon v. The State of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ann Neu
Represented By: B. Clyde Hutchinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigoberto Fernandez Jimenez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's Commercial Transfer, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimenez Trucking
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: B. Clyde Hutchinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California Department of Transportation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: B. Clyde Hutchinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mageela Dixon
Represented By: Michael H. Silvers, NCAED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]