John Caputo v. Scherffenberg

Defendant: Scherffenberg
Plaintiff: John Anthony Caputo
Case Number: 1:2013cv00415
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/20/2014. Response due by 04/12/2014.(Flores, E)
April 14, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion 14 , without Prejudice, on Procedural Grounds and Requiring Defendnats to File Responsive Pleading or Motion within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/14/14. (Verduzco, M)
May 8, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 16 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Reinstating Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss on Court's Calendar; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/08/2014. (30 - Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 9, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted; Objections, if any, Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/2014. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 10/14/2014. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Caputo v. Scherffenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scherffenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Caputo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]