Kirk v. King

Plaintiff: Lawrence Rudy Kirk
Defendant: Audrey King
Case Number: 1:2013cv00428
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:13-cv-0526 KJN PC) to Fresno (1:13-cv-0428 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2013; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
April 5, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 4/5/2013. (Marrujo, C)
September 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminate Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/13: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action and enter judgment. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Rudy Kirk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]