Cervantes v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Ann Cervantes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00431
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time re 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/3/2014. (Hall, S)
March 12, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Second Extension of Time re 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/2014. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/5/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis 3 ; ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/26/2013. (Hall, S)
April 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2013. (Kusamura, W)
May 10, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons and ORDER Directing United States Marshal for Service of the 8 Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/9/2013. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervantes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Ann Cervantes
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.