Quintero v. Comissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anabel L. Quintero
Case Number: 1:2013cv00478
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER For an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/2/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The parties' stipulated request for an extension of time for Defendant to file a responsive brief is GRANTED; 2. Defendant's responsive brief shall be filed on or before January 27, 2014; and 3. Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief on or before February 11, 2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 29, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Complaint 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/29/14: The case is REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Anabel L. Quintero and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
April 4, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/4/2013. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero v. Comissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anabel L. Quintero
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]