Cooper v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Derrick Wadell Cooper
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00487
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and Costs 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/13/13: Plaintiff must comply with this order no later than May 6, 2013, in order to proceed with this action. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J)
April 23, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2013. (Martinez, A)
August 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding the Legal Sufficiency of Plaintiff's 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/2/2013. Objections to F&R due by 9/6/2013. (Martinez, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cooper v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Wadell Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]