Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Maria M Ramirez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00513
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/31/2013. (Martinez, A)
September 30, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/30/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
April 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 USM Instructions) (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M Ramirez
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.