Olvera v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez Olvera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00515
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/2013. (Kusamura, W)
January 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING the Matter Pursuant to Sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Daniel Olvera and Against Defendant, Carolyn Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/08/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act re 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/2014. (Hall, S)
April 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis 4 ; ORDER DISMISSING Complaint With Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/2013. (Hall, S)
May 14, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk To Issue Summons, ORDER Directing United States Marshal For Service Of The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Complaint, # 2 USM Social Security Instructions)(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olvera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez Olvera
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.