Stines, et al. v. Amtrak

Plaintiff: Janet R Stines and Charles Stines
Defendant: Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2013cv00522
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER To Change the Date of the Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for December 18, 2014 is CONTINUED to January 16, 2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on Stipulation and Order to Change the Date of the Settlement Conference Before A Magistrate Judge. (Yu, L)
January 8, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Change the Date of the Settlement Conference Before a Magistrate Judge (Doc. 20 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/2014. The Settlement Conference now set for 1/16/2014 is RESET to 3/27/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Arellano, S.)
February 19, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/18/2014. (Yu, L)
June 24, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/24/2014. (Martinez, A)
July 1, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Date and Extend Discovery and Motion Deadlines. The Jury Trial is now set for December 9, 2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng and the Pretrial Conference is now set for October 24, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/01/2014. (Yu, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stines, et al. v. Amtrak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet R Stines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stines
Represented By: Daniel L. Harralson, M
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]