Arcure, et al. v. Meeker, et al.

Defendant: Douglas Loehner, David Corral, Deborah Meeker, Jeffrey Bradley, Michael Flores, Mark Rodriguez and California Department of Developmental Services
Plaintiff: Lisa Huff, Kathryn Woodside, Kevin Cook, Joseph Fessenden and Yvonne Arcure
Case Number: 1:2013cv00541
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 98 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/14/2014. David Corral is DISMISSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 3, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Depositions by Oral Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2014. (Kusamura, W)
September 22, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference is continued from 9/30/2014 to April 8, 2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/22/2014. (Herman, H)
October 17, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION to Partially Rsolve Discovery Dispute and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2014. (Herman, H)
June 7, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Strike Duplicative Complaints, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/2013. (The Court strikes Duplicative Complaints 2 3 4 & 5 ) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 7, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Vacate Hearing and to Set Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/2013. ( 16 17 18 Motion Hearings set 7/12/2013 are VACATED, Amended Complaint or response to DDS' motions to dismiss due by 6/28/2013, Replies to motions due by 7/10/2013, Response to amended complaint (if filed) due 7/22/2013.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Term Motions 16 17 18 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/25/2013. (Kusamura, W)
July 3, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/3/2013. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/1/20/13, is CONTINUED to 10/2/2013, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) (Gaumnitz, R)
July 18, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO VACATE HEARING (Docs. 27-30) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 18, 2013. (Munoz, I)
July 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND DISMISS 27 28 ; DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 31 ; AND REQUIRING THE FILING OF ANY STIPULATION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 2, 2013 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 19, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 8, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW MOTIONS AND VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; TO REQUEST AN EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; AND TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/8/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
August 9, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: 1) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for September 19, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. 2) The parties shall submit confidential settlement conference statements directly to Magistrate Judge McAuliffe on or before September 12, 2013. Those confidential statements will not be filed with the court. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/9/2013. (Herman, H)
August 9, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/9/2013. (Herman, H)
November 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint (Stipulation Doc. 49): (1) Plaintiffs' request for leave to file Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) On or before November 8, 2013, Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record; (3) Defendant DDS shall have thirty days from the date of service to file a responsive pleading. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2013. (Herman, H)
December 11, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Claims of Plaintiffs Huff and Woodside signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/2013. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Motions To Dismiss And Motion To Sever (Docs. 56 , 66 , 68 , 70 , 72 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/30/2014. (Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcure, et al. v. Meeker, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Loehner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Corral
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Meeker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bradley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Flores
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rodriguez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Huff
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Woodside
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cook
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fessenden
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Arcure
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]