Ekdahl v. Diaz

Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Petitioner: Emil Joseph Ekdahl
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00542
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Re: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 14 ; ORDER DIRECTING Objections to Be Filed Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/26/13:Matter referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
September 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 22 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and ORDER DENYING 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2013. (Jessen, A)
September 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING Respondent to Lodge Transcript of Parole Hearing Within Thirty Days; ORDER PERMITTING Respondent to File Memorandum Brief; ORDER DENYING Petitioner's Motion for Stay as MOOT 27 ; ORDER DENYING as MOOT Petitioner's Motion for Production of New Evidence 30 ; ORDER DENYING as MOOT Petitioner's Motion for Stay 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/3/14. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ekdahl v. Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Krista Leigh Pollard
Represented By: Pamela B. Hooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emil Joseph Ekdahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]