Moore v. Shaw Blackstone Center LLC et al

Defendant: Skechers U.S.A., Inc., BBSN Tiwana LLC, Shaw Blackstone Center LLC and Lamps Plus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00544
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Lamps Plus, Inc., a California Corporation, DBA Lamps Plus #36 Only, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/16/13: Defendant Lamps Plus, Inc., a California corporation, dba Lamps Plus #36 only is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Hellings, J)
September 20, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Settlement as to Defendant BBSN TIWANA LLC ONLY (Doc. 11): this Court ORDERS the parties, no later than October 17, 2013, to file appropriate papers to dismiss Defendant BBSN. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2013. (Herman, H)
October 3, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Settlement 38 : parties, no later than 10/30/2013, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matter. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2013. (Herman, H)
October 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/29/13: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore v. Shaw Blackstone Center LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skechers U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: William McDonald Miller, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBSN Tiwana LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Neilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Blackstone Center LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamps Plus, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]