Reyes v. United States Department of Justice

Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Esperanza Reyes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00545
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Issuance of Summons and New Case Documents; ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 15, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
May 3, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/13: The Court will screen Plaintiff's Complaint in due course. (Hellings, J)
December 31, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING action with leave to amend. Within thirty days of service of this Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint or this action will be dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/31/2013. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.