Valles v. Aguilar et al

Defendant: Laura Labay, David Lampe, Harold Baers, Lisa Green, Adel Shaker, Morongo Indian Reservation and Mark Aguilar
Plaintiff: Frank Valles
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00555
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Order 6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/29/13. (Hellings, J)
December 13, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Comply With a Court Order 7 and 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/12/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 29, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/29/2013. (cc Copy of this Order to Sheriff of the Lerdo Pre-Trial Facility located at 17695 Industrial Farm Road, Bakersfield, CA 93308 via postal mail.) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/30/2013. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty (30) Days. (Attachments: # 1 1983 Amended Complaint Form)(Marrujo, C)
September 10, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/9/2013. Amended Complaint Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Valles v. Aguilar et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Labay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lampe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Baers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Shaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morongo Indian Reservation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Aguilar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Valles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]